EP3796449 - LITHIUM-ION BATTERY AND DEVICE COMPRISING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2021/12] | LITHIUM ION BATTERY AND DEVICE | ||
[2023/32] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.09.2024 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 13.10.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.07.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.02.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.06.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.10.2024 [2024/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Contemporary Amperex Technology (Hong Kong) Limited Level 19, China Building 29 Queen's Road Central Central, Central And Western District / HK | [2024/40] |
Former [2023/46] | For all designated states Contemporary Amperex Technology Co., Limited No.2 Xingang Road Zhangwan Town Jiaocheng District Ningde, Fujian 352100 / CN | ||
Former [2021/12] | For all designated states Contemporary Amperex Technology Co., Limited No. 2, Xin'gang Road, Zhangwan Town Jiaocheng District Ningde City Fujian 352100 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YI, Tiancheng Contemporary Amperex Technology Co., Limited, 2 Xingang Road, Zhangwan Town, Jiaocheng District Ningde, Fujian 352100 / CN | 02 /
HU, Chunhua Contemporary Amperex Technology Co., Limited, 2 Xingang Road, Zhangwan Town, Jiaocheng District Ningde, Fujian 352100 / CN | 03 /
JIANG, Yao Contemporary Amperex Technology Co., Limited, 2 Xingang Road, Zhangwan Town, Jiaocheng District Ningde, Fujian 352100 / CN | 04 /
DOU, Shushi Contemporary Amperex Technology Co., Limited, 2 Xingang Road, Zhangwan Town, Jiaocheng District Ningde, Fujian 352100 / CN | 05 /
LIANG, Chengdu Contemporary Amperex Technology Co., Limited, 2 Xingang Road, Zhangwan Town, Jiaocheng District Ningde, Fujian 352100 / CN | [2021/12] | Representative(s) | Ran, Handong Maucher Jenkins Seventh Floor Offices Artillery House 11-19 Artillery Row London SW1P 1RT / GB | [2023/46] |
Former [2021/12] | Samson & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Widenmayerstraße 6 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 19896480.1 | 13.12.2019 | [2021/12] | WO2019CN125313 | Priority number, date | CN201811535393 | 14.12.2018 Original published format: CN201811535393 | [2021/12] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020119799 | Date: | 18.06.2020 | Language: | ZH | [2020/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3796449 | Date: | 24.03.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3796449 | Date: | 15.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 18.06.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.08.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H01M4/525, H01M10/0525, H01M10/0567, H01M10/42, // H01M50/103, H01M50/105 | [2021/39] | CPC: |
H01M4/525 (EP,CN,US);
H01M4/364 (CN);
H01M10/0567 (EP,CN,US);
C07D239/04 (US);
C07D241/04 (US);
C07D251/04 (US);
C07D295/15 (US);
C07D403/04 (US);
H01M10/0525 (EP,CN,US);
H01M10/0569 (US);
H01M10/4235 (EP,CN,US);
H01M4/628 (CN);
H01M2004/028 (CN,US);
H01M2300/0025 (EP,CN,US);
H01M2300/004 (US);
|
Former IPC [2021/12] | H01M10/0525 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/12] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LITHIUMIONENBATTERIE UND VORRICHTUNG DIESELBE UMFASSEND | [2023/32] | English: | LITHIUM-ION BATTERY AND DEVICE COMPRISING THE SAME | [2023/32] | French: | BATTERIE AU LITHIUM-ION ET DISPOSITIF LA COMPRENANT | [2023/32] |
Former [2021/12] | LITHIUMIONENBATTERIE UND VORRICHTUNG | ||
Former [2021/12] | LITHIUM ION BATTERY AND DEVICE | ||
Former [2021/12] | BATTERIE AU LITHIUM-ION ET DISPOSITIF | Entry into regional phase | 18.12.2020 | Translation filed | 18.12.2020 | National basic fee paid | 18.12.2020 | Search fee paid | 18.12.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.12.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.12.2020 | Examination requested [2021/12] | 22.10.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.07.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.10.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 10.10.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.10.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 19.08.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 15.11.2023 | ES | 15.11.2023 | HR | 15.11.2023 | MC | 15.11.2023 | PL | 15.11.2023 | RO | 15.11.2023 | RS | 15.11.2023 | SK | 15.11.2023 | SM | 15.11.2023 | NO | 15.02.2024 | GR | 16.02.2024 | IS | 15.03.2024 | [2024/40] |
Former [2024/36] | CZ | 15.11.2023 | |
ES | 15.11.2023 | ||
HR | 15.11.2023 | ||
PL | 15.11.2023 | ||
RO | 15.11.2023 | ||
RS | 15.11.2023 | ||
SK | 15.11.2023 | ||
SM | 15.11.2023 | ||
NO | 15.02.2024 | ||
GR | 16.02.2024 | ||
IS | 15.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | CZ | 15.11.2023 | |
ES | 15.11.2023 | ||
HR | 15.11.2023 | ||
PL | 15.11.2023 | ||
RO | 15.11.2023 | ||
RS | 15.11.2023 | ||
SM | 15.11.2023 | ||
NO | 15.02.2024 | ||
GR | 16.02.2024 | ||
IS | 15.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | ES | 15.11.2023 | |
HR | 15.11.2023 | ||
PL | 15.11.2023 | ||
RS | 15.11.2023 | ||
SM | 15.11.2023 | ||
NO | 15.02.2024 | ||
GR | 16.02.2024 | ||
IS | 15.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | ES | 15.11.2023 | |
HR | 15.11.2023 | ||
PL | 15.11.2023 | ||
RS | 15.11.2023 | ||
NO | 15.02.2024 | ||
GR | 16.02.2024 | ||
IS | 15.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 16.02.2024 | |
IS | 15.03.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2004142240 (NAGAYAMA MASATOSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-11 * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0022] * * examples 1-12; tables 1-2 * * examples C4-C15; tables 4, 5 * * examples 13-20, C16-C19; tables 6, 7 * * examples 21-32, C20, C21; tables 8, 9 * * examples 33-42, C22, C23; tables 10, 11 * * examples 43-57, C24-C26; tables 12-14 ** claims 1-4 *; | [A]US2005042519 (ROH KWON SUN [KR], et al) [A] 1-11 * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0014] * * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0023] * * paragraph [0027] * * paragraph [0030] * * examples 1-8; table 1 * * claims 1-6, 14 *; | [A]EP2120279 (MITSUBISHI CHEM CORP [JP]) [A] 1-11 * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0024] * * paragraph [0087] - paragraph [0092] * * paragraph [0096] * * paragraph [0098] - paragraph [0101] * * paragraph [0161] - paragraph [0165] * * paragraph [0196] * * examples 1-5, 7; table 1 * * examples 10-17; table 2 * * examples 18-25; table 3 * * examples 26-29, 31, 34-36; table 6 * * examples 38-41, 43; table 8 * * examples 45-47; table 9 * * example 63; table 11 * * claims 1, 10-14, 16, 18-22, 25, 27-29, 31 *; | [A]CN103022556 (NINGDE AMPEREX TECHNOLOGY LTD) [A] 1-11 * abstract * * examples 1, 4, 5, 8-15; table 1 * * claims 1-10 *; | [A]CN103078140 (NINGDE AMPEREX TECHNOLOGY LTD) [A] 1-11 * abstract * * examples 1-15; table 1 * * claims 1-9 *; | [A]CN103618081 (NANTONG RESHINE NEW MATERIAL CO LTD) [A] 1-11 * abstract * * claims 1, 4, 5 *; | [A]EP3279998 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]) [A] 1-11 * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0014] * * paragraph [0018] * * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0049] * * paragraph [0056] * * paragraph [0079] * * example 1.1 * * claims 1-3, 6-9, 11, 12, 17 * |