EP3895788 - POWER GENERATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 28.10.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.09.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.06.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.10.2022 | Withdrawal of application | published on 30.11.2022 [2022/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toray Industries, Inc. 1-1, Nihonbashi-muromachi, 2-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8666 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2021/42] | For all designated states Toray Industries, Inc. 1-1, Nihonbashi-muromachi, 2-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo, 103-8666 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TOKUYAMA Takahiro c/o Shiga Plant, Toray Industries, Inc., 1-1, Sonoyama 1-chome Otsu-shi, Shiga 520-8558 / JP | 02 /
IIZUKA Rina c/o Shiga Plant, Toray Industries, Inc., 1-1, Sonoyama 1-chome Otsu-shi, Shiga 520-8558 / JP | 03 /
YAMADA Hiroyuki c/o Shiga Plant, Toray Industries, Inc., 1-1, Sonoyama 1-chome Otsu-shi, Shiga 520-8558 / JP | 04 /
KIMURA Masahiro c/o Shiga Plant, Toray Industries, Inc., 1-1, Sonoyama 1-chome Otsu-shi, Shiga 520-8558 / JP | [2021/42] | Representative(s) | Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Pilgersheimer Straße 20 81543 München / DE | [2021/42] | Application number, filing date | 19896806.7 | 11.12.2019 | [2021/42] | WO2019JP48577 | Priority number, date | JP20180231444 | 11.12.2018 Original published format: JP 2018231444 | [2021/42] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020122152 | Date: | 18.06.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3895788 | Date: | 20.10.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 18.06.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.10.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B01D63/10, B01D69/10, B01D69/12, B01D71/56, C01B3/00, C01B3/56, B01D53/22, H01M8/04, H01M8/04791, H01M8/0662, H01M8/10, H01M8/12 | [2021/42] | CPC: |
B01D71/64 (EP,KR,US);
H01M8/0687 (EP,KR,US);
B01D53/228 (EP,KR,US);
B01D61/422 (US);
B01D63/10 (KR,US);
B01D67/0006 (EP);
B01D67/00931 (EP,KR,US);
B01D69/10 (KR,US);
B01D69/12 (KR,US);
B01D69/1251 (EP,KR,US);
B01D71/0211 (EP,KR,US);
B01D71/022 (EP,KR,US);
B01D71/02231 (EP);
B01D71/0281 (EP,KR,US);
B01D71/56 (EP,KR,US);
C01B3/503 (EP,US);
C01B3/508 (US);
H01M8/0213 (US);
H01M8/04089 (US);
H01M8/04097 (EP,KR,US);
B01D2256/16 (EP,US);
B01D2258/0208 (EP,US);
B01D2311/2684 (EP,US);
B01D2323/30 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/42] | Title | German: | STROMERZEUGUNGSSYSTEM | [2021/42] | English: | POWER GENERATION SYSTEM | [2021/42] | French: | SYSTÈME DE PRODUCTION D'ÉNERGIE | [2021/42] | Entry into regional phase | 08.06.2021 | Translation filed | 08.06.2021 | National basic fee paid | 08.06.2021 | Search fee paid | 08.06.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.06.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.06.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.06.2021 | Examination requested [2021/42] | 26.10.2022 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2022/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP2009295377 (TOYOTA BOSHOKU CORP); | [Y]WO2012105397 (TORAY INDUSTRIES [JP], et al); | [Y]JP2016029183 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO); | [Y]WO2018079729 (TORAY INDUSTRIES [JP]); | [Y]JP2018162184 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD); | [Y]WO2018221684 (TORAY INDUSTRIES [JP]) | International search | [Y]JP2009295377 (TOYOTA BOSHOKU CORP); | [Y]WO2012105397 (TORAY INDUSTRIES [JP], et al); | [Y]JP2016029183 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO); | [Y]WO2018079729 (TORAY INDUSTRIES [JP]); | [Y]JP2018162184 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD); | [Y]WO2018221684 (TORAY INDUSTRIES [JP]) | by applicant | JP2004006948 | JP2007042607 | JP2009295377 | WO2014098038 | US2015273403 | JP6107000B | JP6142730B | JP2019118859 | JP20180231444 |