EP3778677 - CATALYST COMPOSITION, METHOD OF PREPARING THE COMPOSITION, METHOD OF PREPARING CONJUGATED DIENE-BASED POLYMER BY USING THE COMPOSITION, AND CONJUGATED DIENE-BASED POLYMER PREPARED BY THE METHOD OF PREPARING THE POLYMER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2021/07] | CATALYST COMPOSITION, PREPARING METHOD THEREFOR, METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING CONJUGATED DIENE-BASED POLYMER BY USING SAME, AND CONJUGATED DIENE-BASED POLYMER MANUFACTURED BY SAME POLYMER MANUFACTURING METHOD | ||
[2023/19] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.05.2024 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.06.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.04.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.01.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.06.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG CHEM, LTD. 128, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07336 / KR | [2021/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Su Hwa LG Chem Research Park, 188, Munji-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 02 /
BAE, Hyo Jin LG Chem Research Park, 188, Munji-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 03 /
OH, Kyoung Hwan LG Chem Research Park, 188, Munji-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | [2021/07] | Representative(s) | Plasseraud IP 104 Rue de Richelieu CS92104 75080 Paris Cedex 02 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2021/07] | Plasseraud IP 66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 19897334.9 | 13.12.2019 | [2021/07] | WO2019KR17737 | Priority number, date | KR20180161089 | 13.12.2018 Original published format: KR 20180161089 | [2021/07] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020122680 | Date: | 18.06.2020 | Language: | KO | [2020/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3778677 | Date: | 17.02.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3778677 | Date: | 26.07.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 18.06.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.06.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C08F136/06, C08F4/54 | [2023/18] | CPC: |
C08F4/545 (EP,KR,US);
C08F236/04 (KR,US);
B01J31/0211 (US);
C08F136/06 (EP);
C08F8/20 (KR);
C08F2500/03 (KR)
| C-Set: |
C08F136/06, C08F4/545 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2021/30] | C08F236/04, C08F4/54, C08F8/20, C08F236/06 | ||
Former IPC [2021/07] | C08F236/04, C08F4/54, C08F8/20 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/07] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KATALYSATORZUSAMMENSETZUNG, VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DER ZUSAMMENSETZUNG, VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES KONJUGIERTEN POLYMERS AUF DIENBASIS UNTER VERWENDUNG DER ZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND KONJUGIERTES POLYMER AUF DIENBASIS, HERGESTELLT DURCH DAS VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DES POLYMERS | [2023/19] | English: | CATALYST COMPOSITION, METHOD OF PREPARING THE COMPOSITION, METHOD OF PREPARING CONJUGATED DIENE-BASED POLYMER BY USING THE COMPOSITION, AND CONJUGATED DIENE-BASED POLYMER PREPARED BY THE METHOD OF PREPARING THE POLYMER | [2023/19] | French: | Composition de catalyseur, méthode de préparation de la composition, méthode de préparation d'un polymère conjugué à base de diène en utilisant la composition, et polymère conjugué à base de diène préparé par la méthode de préparation du polymère | [2023/19] |
Former [2021/07] | KATALYSATORZUSAMMENSETZUNG, VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG, VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON POLYMER AUF BASIS VON KONJUGIERTEM DIEN DAMIT UND MIT DEM POLYMERHERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN HERGESTELLTES POLYMER AUF BASIS VON KONJUGIERTEM DIEN | ||
Former [2021/07] | CATALYST COMPOSITION, PREPARING METHOD THEREFOR, METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING CONJUGATED DIENE-BASED POLYMER BY USING SAME, AND CONJUGATED DIENE-BASED POLYMER MANUFACTURED BY SAME POLYMER MANUFACTURING METHOD | ||
Former [2021/07] | COMPOSITION DE CATALYSEUR, SON PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION, PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN POLYMÈRE DIÉNIQUE CONJUGUÉ L'UTILISANT, ET POLYMÈRE DIÉNIQUE CONJUGUÉ FABRIQUÉ PAR LE MÊME PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DU POLYMÈRE | Entry into regional phase | 03.11.2020 | Translation filed | 03.11.2020 | National basic fee paid | 03.11.2020 | Search fee paid | 03.11.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.11.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.11.2020 | Examination requested [2021/07] | 03.12.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.04.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.06.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 19.06.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.06.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 29.04.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 26.07.2023 | CZ | 26.07.2023 | DK | 26.07.2023 | EE | 26.07.2023 | ES | 26.07.2023 | FI | 26.07.2023 | HR | 26.07.2023 | LT | 26.07.2023 | LV | 26.07.2023 | NL | 26.07.2023 | PL | 26.07.2023 | RO | 26.07.2023 | RS | 26.07.2023 | SE | 26.07.2023 | SK | 26.07.2023 | SM | 26.07.2023 | NO | 26.10.2023 | GR | 27.10.2023 | IS | 26.11.2023 | PT | 27.11.2023 | [2024/23] |
Former [2024/22] | AT | 26.07.2023 | |
CZ | 26.07.2023 | ||
DK | 26.07.2023 | ||
FI | 26.07.2023 | ||
HR | 26.07.2023 | ||
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
LV | 26.07.2023 | ||
NL | 26.07.2023 | ||
PL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RO | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
SE | 26.07.2023 | ||
SM | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
PT | 27.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AT | 26.07.2023 | |
FI | 26.07.2023 | ||
HR | 26.07.2023 | ||
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
LV | 26.07.2023 | ||
NL | 26.07.2023 | ||
PL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
SE | 26.07.2023 | ||
SM | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
PT | 27.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 26.07.2023 | |
FI | 26.07.2023 | ||
HR | 26.07.2023 | ||
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
LV | 26.07.2023 | ||
NL | 26.07.2023 | ||
PL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
SE | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
PT | 27.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 26.07.2023 | |
FI | 26.07.2023 | ||
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
NL | 26.07.2023 | ||
SE | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 26.07.2023 | |
NL | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/05] | NL | 26.07.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0713885 (NIPPON ZEON CO [JP]) [A] 1-13* the whole document *; | [A]EP1939221 (BRIDGESTONE CORP [JP]) [A] 1-13 * examples 1-12; claims 1-13 *; | [A]EP3222639 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]) [A] 1-13 * examples 1-7; claims 1-23 * | International search | [A]JP2009013420 (BRIDGESTONE CORP) [A] 1-13 * See claims 1-11; paragraphs [0112]-[0114], example 1. *; | [A]KR20160064819 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]) [A] 1-13 * See the entire document. *; | [X]KR20170075671 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]) [X] 1-13 * See claims 1, 5, 6, 8-10, 13-15; paragraphs [0053], [0064], [0090], [0094]. *; | [A]KR20180065892 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]) [A] 1-13* See the entire document. *; | [X]KR101899637B (LG CHEM, LTD.) [X] 1-13 * See claim 1; table 2, example 2. * | by applicant | KR910008275B |