Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11870991 | Global Dossier | 09.01.2024 | B2 | US2023140961 | 11.05.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202318150576 | 05.01.2023 | US201962807803 | 20.02.2019 | WO2019CN124271 | 10.12.2019 | US201962794802 | 21.01.2019 | US201862781130 | 18.12.2018 | US202117414662 | 16.06.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11589050 | Global Dossier | 21.02.2023 | B2 | US2022046239 | 10.02.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201962807803 | 20.02.2019 | WO2019CN124271 | 10.12.2019 | US201962794802 | 21.01.2019 | US201862781130 | 18.12.2018 | US201917414662 | 10.12.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN117750022 | Global Dossier | 22.03.2024 | A | Priority number | Date | US201962807803 | 20.02.2019 | WO2019CN124271 | 10.12.2019 | CN201980084170 | 10.12.2019 | US201962794802 | 21.01.2019 | US201862781130 | 18.12.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN113228638B | Global Dossier | 26.12.2023 | B | CN113228638 | 06.08.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | US201962807803 | 20.02.2019 | WO2019CN124271 | 10.12.2019 | US201962794802 | 21.01.2019 | US201862781130 | 18.12.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3895420 | Global Dossier | 31.08.2022 | A4 | EP3895420 | 20.10.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201962807803 | 20.02.2019 | WO2019CN124271 | 10.12.2019 | US201962794802 | 21.01.2019 | US201862781130 | 18.12.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2021007374 | 15.07.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | US201962807803 | 20.02.2019 | WO2019CN124271 | 10.12.2019 | US201962794802 | 21.01.2019 | US201862781130 | 18.12.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI749420B | 11.12.2021 | B | TW202029761 | 01.08.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | US201962807803 | 20.02.2019 | WO2019CN124271 | 10.12.2019 | US201962794802 | 21.01.2019 | US201862781130 | 18.12.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2020125490 | Global Dossier | 25.06.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201962807803 | 20.02.2019 | US201962794802 | 21.01.2019 | US201862781130 | 18.12.2018 |