EP3912684 - CERAMIDE DISPERSION COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.10.2021 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.07.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.12.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Genuine R&D Co., Ltd. 2-36-12, Takamidai Higashi-ku Fukuoka-shi, Fukuoka 811-0215 / JP | [2021/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ARAKAWA, Jun c/o Kyoto laboratory, Genuine R&D Co., Ltd., 3-2- 16, Hikaridai, Seika-cho Soraku-gun, Kyoto 619-0237 / JP | 02 /
KAMIYA, Naoki c/o Kyoto laboratory, Genuine R&D Co., Ltd., 3-2- 16, Hikaridai, Seika-cho Soraku-gun, Kyoto 619-0237 / JP | 03 /
HIRAKI, Shinobu c/o Genuine R&D Co., Ltd., 2-36-12, Takamidai, Higashi-ku Fukuoka-shi, Fukuoka 811-0215 / JP | 04 /
MIYANABE, Masakatsu c/o Tokyo Office, Genuine R&D Co., Ltd., 1-7-5, Shiba, Minato-ku Tokyo 105-0014 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2021/47] | 01 /
ARAKAWA, Jun Soraku-gun, Kyoto 619-0237 / JP | ||
02 /
KAMIYA, Naoki Soraku-gun, Kyoto 619-0237 / JP | |||
03 /
HIRAKI, Shinobu Fukuoka-shi, Fukuoka 811-0215 / JP | |||
04 /
MIYANABE, Masakatsu Tokyo 105-0014 / JP | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [2021/47] | Application number, filing date | 19898550.9 | 16.12.2019 | [2021/47] | WO2019JP49253 | Priority number, date | JP20180236171 | 18.12.2018 Original published format: JP 2018236171 | [2021/47] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020129920 | Date: | 25.06.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3912684 | Date: | 24.11.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 25.06.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.03.2023 | Classification | IPC: | A61Q19/00, B82Y30/00, A23L33/115, A61K8/04, A61K8/34, A61K8/39, A61K8/49, A61K8/55, A61K8/68, A61K8/92 | [2023/15] | CPC: |
A23L33/115 (EP,KR,US);
A61K8/68 (EP,KR,US);
A61K8/04 (EP,KR,US);
A61K8/345 (EP,KR,US);
A61K8/361 (KR,US);
A61K8/37 (KR);
A61K8/39 (EP,KR);
A61K8/4993 (EP);
A61K8/553 (EP,KR,US);
A61K8/63 (KR);
A61K8/922 (EP);
A61Q19/00 (EP,KR);
|
Former IPC [2021/47] | A61Q19/00, B82Y30/00, A23L33/115, A61K8/04, A61K8/34, A61K8/37, A61K8/39, A61K8/55, A61K8/63, A61K8/68 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/47] | Title | German: | CERAMID-DISPERSIONSZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [2021/51] | English: | CERAMIDE DISPERSION COMPOSITION | [2021/47] | French: | COMPOSITION DE DISPERSION DE CÉRAMIDE | [2021/47] |
Former [2021/47] | CERAMIDE DISPERSION COMPOSITION | Entry into regional phase | 22.09.2021 | Translation filed | 22.09.2021 | National basic fee paid | 22.09.2021 | Search fee paid | 22.09.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.09.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Deletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/47] | 10.08.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time [2021/47] | 22.09.2021 | Examination requested [2021/47] | 28.09.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to file the translation | 22.09.2021 | Request for further processing filed | 22.09.2021 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 20.10.2021 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the search fee | 22.09.2021 | Request for further processing filed | 22.09.2021 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 20.10.2021 | Decision despatched | 22.09.2021 | Request for further processing filed | 22.09.2021 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 20.10.2021 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the filing fee | 22.09.2021 | Request for further processing filed | 22.09.2021 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 20.10.2021 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee | 22.09.2021 | Request for further processing filed | 22.09.2021 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 20.10.2021 | Decision despatched | 22.09.2021 | Request for further processing filed | 22.09.2021 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 20.10.2021 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees TR, SM, SK, SI, SE, RS, RO, PT, PL, NO, NL, MT, MK, MC, LV, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HU, HR, GR, GB, FR, FI, ES, EE, DK, DE, CZ, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT, AL | 22.09.2021 | Request for further processing filed | 22.09.2021 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 20.10.2021 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2010090092 (FUJIFILM CORP) [A] 1-13 * example 11 *; | [A]US2011224310 (SERIZAWA SHINICHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [XD]WO2015136784 (FUJIFILM CORP [JP]) [XD] 1-10,12,13 * Comparative compositions 2 and 4;; table 3 *; | [I]US9522110 (YANAGI TERUKAZU [JP], et al) [I] 1-13 * the whole document * * tables 1-3 * * column 19 - column 20 *; | [X]EP3117821 (FUJIFILM CORP [JP]) [X] 1-10,12,13 * examples 5, 6; table 1 * * Comparative examples 3 and 6;; table 3 *; | [A]US2017119884 (CHOU KEN-CHUAN [TW], et al) [A] 1-13 * claims 1-8 * * figures 2, 3 *; | [X]KR20180047531 (PARK SO YOUNG [KR]) [X] 1-3,5,7,8,13 * example 1 *; | [E]DE102019003487 (NSC PHARMA GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [E] 1-3,5-8,11,13* tables 1, 2 * | International search | [Y]JP2010090092 (FUJIFILM CORP) [Y] 1-13 * , claims, paragraphs [0035], [0065]-[0098] *; | [Y]WO2010058853 (FUJIFILM CORP [JP], et al) [Y] 1-13 * , claims, paragraphs [0074]-[0078], [0088]-[0115], table 2 *; | [Y]JP2010120857 (DOCTOR PROGRAM KK) [Y] 1-13 * , paragraph [0009] *; | [Y]JP2012126910 (MIYANABE MASAKATSU) [Y] 1-13 * , claims, paragraphs [0001], [0018], [0038]-[0041], [0051]-[0073], table 1, fig. 1-6 *; | [A]JP2014169238 (MARUZEN PHARMA) [A] 1-13* , claims *; | [Y]JP2015174841 (FUJIFILM CORP) [Y] 1-13 * , claims, paragraphs [0005], [0078]-[0093], [0097]-[0100], [0130], tables 1-3 *; | [Y]WO2018021476 (SATICINE MEDICAL CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-13 * , claims, paragraphs [0006]-[0009], [0013], [0014], [0018]-[0023], [0028]-[0030], [0049]-[0053], fig. 1-12 *; | [Y]JP2018021009 (MIKIMOTO SEIYAKU KK) [Y] 1-13 * , claims, paragraphs [0002], [0004], [0005], [0009], [0011], [0024], tables 1-3 * | by applicant | JP2012126910 | - Fragrance Journal, (20131200), pages 44 - 49 |