EP3899104 - ANODE ASSEMBLY AND ELECTROLYTIC CELL COMPRISING SAID ANODE ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.09.2021 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.07.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.06.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 24.07.2024 [2024/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rio Tinto Alcan International Limited 400-1190, avenue des Canadiens de Montréal Montréal, Québec H3B 0E3 / CA | [2021/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RENAUDIER, Steeve 140 Rue du Général Ménabréa 73250 Saint Pierre D'Albigny / FR | 02 /
CARATINI, Yves 9 rue Lamartine 73490 La Ravoire / FR | 03 /
MUNOZ, David 1 Allée de la Piat 38340 Meylan / FR | [2021/43] | Representative(s) | Germain Maureau 12, rue Boileau 69006 Lyon / FR | [2021/43] | Application number, filing date | 19899791.8 | 12.12.2019 | [2021/43] | WO2019CA51798 | Priority number, date | FR20180073567 | 20.12.2018 Original published format: FR 1873567 | [2021/43] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020124210 | Date: | 25.06.2020 | Language: | FR | [2020/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3899104 | Date: | 27.10.2021 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.06.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 25.06.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.06.2024 | Classification | IPC: | C25C3/12, C25C3/16 | [2024/30] | CPC: |
C25C3/125 (EP);
C25C3/16 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2021/43] | C25C3/12 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/43] | Title | German: | ANODENANORDNUNG UND ELEKTROLYSEZELLE MIT DIESER ANODENANORDNUNG | [2021/43] | English: | ANODE ASSEMBLY AND ELECTROLYTIC CELL COMPRISING SAID ANODE ASSEMBLY | [2021/43] | French: | ENSEMBLE ANODIQUE ET CUVE D'ELECTROLYSE COMPRENANT CET ENSEMBLE ANODIQUE | [2021/43] | Entry into regional phase | 22.06.2021 | National basic fee paid | 22.06.2021 | Search fee paid | 22.06.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.06.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.06.2021 | Examination requested [2021/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2527229 (ALUMINIUM GRECE [GR]); | [A]FR2900938 (ECL SOC PAR ACTIONS SIMPLIFIEE [FR]); | [A]WO2016130014 (NORSK HYDRO AS [NO]) | International search | [A]US4490233 (CASDAS SPYRIDON [GR]); | [A]WO2007132081 (ECL [FR], et al); | [A]CN106757164 (GUIYANG ALUMINUM MAGNESIUM DESIGN & RES INST CO LTD); | [A]CN109023427 (FUJIAN NANPING ALUMINUM CO LTD, et al) |