EP3897463 - CRANIAL IMPLANT WITH DURAL WINDOW [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.07.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.09.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.07.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.07.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.08.2023 [2023/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Longeviti Neuro Solutions LLC 303 International Circle Suite 190 Hunt Valley, MD 21030 / US | [2021/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHRISTOPHER, Jesse 12819 Falls Road Hunt Valley, MD 21030 / US | 02 /
RABINOVITZ, Brad 717 Crisfield Way Annapolis, MD 21401 / US | 03 /
GORDON, Chad, R. 12320 Cleghorn Rd. Cockeysville, MD 21030 / US | [2021/43] | Representative(s) | Glück Kritzenberger Patentanwälte PartGmbB Franz-Mayer-Str. 16a 93053 Regensburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/43] | Glück Kritzenberger Patentanwälte PartGmbB Hermann-Köhl-Strasse 2a 93049 Regensburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 19899848.6 | 19.12.2019 | [2021/43] | WO2019US67561 | Priority number, date | US201862781925P | 19.12.2018 Original published format: US 201862781925 P | [2021/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020132290 | Date: | 25.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3897463 | Date: | 27.10.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.06.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 25.06.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.08.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/28 | [2022/37] | CPC: |
A61F2/2875 (EP,US);
A61B5/0059 (US);
A61B5/4064 (US);
A61F2/30749 (EP,US);
A61F2/30942 (EP);
A61B2017/00907 (EP);
A61B2017/0092 (EP);
A61B2017/00924 (EP);
A61B2090/103 (EP);
A61B2090/3966 (EP);
A61F2002/3008 (EP,US);
A61F2002/3009 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30092 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30617 (EP);
A61F2310/00353 (US);
A61N1/0529 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2021/43] | A61F2/28, A61B5/04, A61N1/05, A61N1/36, A61N1/375 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/43] | Title | German: | SCHÄDELIMPLANTAT MIT DURALFENSTER | [2021/43] | English: | CRANIAL IMPLANT WITH DURAL WINDOW | [2021/43] | French: | IMPLANT CRÂNIEN À FENÊTRE DURALE | [2021/43] | Entry into regional phase | 19.07.2021 | National basic fee paid | 19.07.2021 | Search fee paid | 19.07.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.07.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.06.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.07.2021 | Examination requested [2021/43] | 10.03.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/33] | 30.03.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2023/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2012147114 (MAKO SHARK SRL [IT], et al) [A] 9 * abstract * * page 3, line 6 - line 12 ** figure 1 *; | [X]US2018055640 (GORDON CHAD R [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5,6,12,13,15 * paragraph [0047] - paragraph [0051] * * paragraph [0053] * * figure 13 *; | [X]WO2018064239 (SAMPATH PRAKASH [US], et al) [X] 1,7,8,10,11,13,14 * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0053] * * figures 1A-1E *; | [XA]US2018325672 (GORDON CHAD R [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5,6,11-15 * paragraph [0047] - paragraph [0056] * * paragraph [0059] - paragraph [0062] * * paragraph [0065] - paragraph [0069] * * figures 2F,4 * [A] 3,4,9 | International search | [A]WO9841152 (BERNOSKI FRANCISCUS PIETER [NL]) [A] 1-20 * entire document *; | [XY]US2004073270 (FIRLIK ANDREW D [US], et al) [X] 1, 9-11, 13, 14, 17, 20 * entire document * [Y] 2-8, 12, 15, 16, 18, 19; | [Y]US2009254052 (BIRK JANEL A [US], et al) [Y] 12 * entire document *; | [Y]US2017027629 (ACKERMAN MATTHEW [US], et al) [Y] 2-7 * entire document *; | [A]US2017156596 (AGUILAR-MENDOZA GUILLERMO [US], et al) [A] 1-20* entire document *; | [Y]US2018055640 (GORDON CHAD R [US], et al) [Y] 8, 15, 16, 18, 19 * entire document * |