EP3900646 - FIRING MECHANISM FOR A SURGICAL STAPLER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2021/43] | FIRING MECHANISM AND ANASTOMAT | ||
[2024/28] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.06.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.10.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.09.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.07.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.06.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Touchstone International Medical Science Co., Ltd. 278 Dongping Street, Suzhou Industrial Park Suzhou, Jiangsu 215123 / CN | [2024/29] |
Former [2021/43] | For all designated states Touchstone International Medical Science Co., Ltd. 278 Dongping Street, Suzhou Industrial Park Suzhou Jiangsu 215123 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHAN, Teng 278 Dongping Street, Suzhou Industrial Park Suzhou, Jiangsu 215123 / CN | 02 /
CAO, Yuanyang 278 Dongping Street, Suzhou Industrial Park Suzhou, Jiangsu 215123 / CN | 03 /
HUANG, Xueqian 278 Dongping Street, Suzhou Industrial Park Suzhou, Jiangsu 215123 / CN | [2021/43] | Representative(s) | Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2021/43] | Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 19900141.3 | 20.12.2019 | [2021/43] | WO2019CN127100 | Priority number, date | CN201822152931U | 20.12.2018 Original published format: CN 201822152931 U | CN201811563035 | 20.12.2018 Original published format: CN201811563035 | CN201920187434U | 02.02.2019 Original published format: CN 201920187434 U | [2021/43] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020125765 | Date: | 25.06.2020 | Language: | ZH | [2020/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3900646 | Date: | 27.10.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 25.06.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.03.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/115, A61B17/072, // A61B17/00, A61B90/00 | [2022/06] | CPC: |
A61B17/1155 (EP,KR,US);
A61B17/115 (KR);
A61B17/072 (EP,KR,US);
A61B17/1114 (KR);
A61B90/03 (EP,KR);
A61B2017/00123 (KR);
A61B2017/00367 (US);
A61B2017/00407 (EP,KR);
A61B2017/0042 (US);
|
Former IPC [2021/43] | A61B17/115, A61B17/072 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/43] | Title | German: | AUSLÖSEMECHANISMUS FÜR EIN CHIRURGISCHES KLAMMERGERÄT | [2024/28] | English: | FIRING MECHANISM FOR A SURGICAL STAPLER | [2024/28] | French: | MÉCANISME DE DÉCLENCHEMENT D'UNE AGRAFEUSE CHIRURGICALE | [2024/28] |
Former [2021/43] | FEUERUNGSMECHANISMUS UND ANASTOMAT | ||
Former [2021/43] | FIRING MECHANISM AND ANASTOMAT | ||
Former [2021/43] | MÉCANISME DE DÉCLENCHEMENT ET DISPOSITIF D'ANASTOMOSE | Entry into regional phase | 09.06.2021 | Translation filed | 09.06.2021 | National basic fee paid | 09.06.2021 | Search fee paid | 09.06.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.06.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.06.2021 | Examination requested [2021/43] | 06.06.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.10.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.01.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.06.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]EP2090251 (ETHICON ENDO SURGERY INC [US]); | [A]CN104224260 (CHONGQING QMI SURGICAL CO LTD); | [A]US2015136833 (SHELTON IV FREDERICK E [US], et al); | [IA]CN108403176 (ENGINE MEDICAL EQUIPMENT MFG SHANGHAI CO LTD) |