EP3897971 - LITHIUM EXTRACTION WITH CROWN ETHERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.09.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.09.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.07.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.09.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.10.2023 [2023/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states 6th Wave Innovations Corp. 907 Golden Eye Court Arnold, Maryland 21012 / US | [2021/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GLUCKMAN, Jonathan P. c/o 6th Wave Innovations Corp. 907 Golden Eye Court Arnold, Maryland 21012 / US | 02 /
KRAFT, Garrett c/o 6th Wave Innovations Corp. 907 Golden Eye Court Arnold, Maryland 21012 / US | 03 /
SOUTHARD, Glen c/o 6th Wave Innovations Corp. 907 Golden Eye Court Arnold, Maryland 21012 / US | [2021/43] | Representative(s) | Cooley (UK) LLP 22 Bishopsgate London EC2N 4BQ / GB | [2021/43] | Application number, filing date | 19900275.9 | 17.12.2019 | [2021/43] | WO2019US66985 | Priority number, date | US201862780686P | 17.12.2018 Original published format: US 201862780686 P | [2021/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020131964 | Date: | 25.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3897971 | Date: | 27.10.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.06.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 25.06.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.09.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B01J20/26, C07D323/00, C07F9/655, B01J20/28, B01J20/32, C22B3/26, C22B26/12, B01D11/04, C22B3/24 | [2022/42] | CPC: |
C07F9/65527 (EP,US);
C07D323/00 (EP,US);
B01D11/0492 (EP);
B01J20/28057 (EP);
B01J20/3204 (EP);
B01J20/3255 (EP);
C22B26/12 (EP,US);
C22B3/24 (EP);
C22B3/304 (EP,US);
Y02P10/20 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2021/43] | B01J20/26, C07D323/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/43] | Title | German: | EXTRAKTION VON LITHIUM MIT KRONENETHERN | [2021/43] | English: | LITHIUM EXTRACTION WITH CROWN ETHERS | [2021/43] | French: | EXTRACTION DE LITHIUM AVEC DES ÉTHERS COURONNES | [2021/43] | Entry into regional phase | 13.07.2021 | National basic fee paid | 13.07.2021 | Search fee paid | 13.07.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.07.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.07.2021 | Examination requested [2021/43] | 07.02.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.04.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/41] | 12.05.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2023/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPS61260078 (NIPPON OILS & FATS CO LTD) [X] 1 * compound II page 568 *; | [X]WO2009088281 (MIMOS BERHAD [MY], et al) [X] 1 * page 8 compound IV n=0 *; | [XI] - TORREJOS REY ELISEO C ET AL, "Design of lithium selective crown ethers: Synthesis, extraction and theoretical binding studies", CHEMICAL ENGENEERING JOURNAL, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20170603), vol. 326, doi:10.1016/J.CEJ.2017.06.005, ISSN 1385-8947, pages 921 - 933, XP085129088 [X] 1,15-18 * compound 3a page 927 * [I] 1-18 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.cej.2017.06.005 | [X] - GREENAWALT PETER J. ET AL, "Voltammetric Mechanism of Multiion Detection with Thin Ionophore-Based Polymeric Membrane", ANALYTICAL CHEMISTRY, US, (20160509), vol. 88, no. 11, doi:10.1021/acs.analchem.6b00397, ISSN 0003-2700, pages 5827 - 5834, XP055955661 [X] 1 * page 5828 compound 4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/acs.analchem.6b00397 | [X] - KEIICHI KIMURA ET AL, "Novel Lithium-selective lonophores bearing an Easily Ionizable Moiety", JOURNAL OF THE CHEMICAL SOCIETY, CHEMICAL COMMUNICATIONS, GB, (19851002), vol. 10, ISSN 0022-4936, pages 669 - 670, XP055955695 [X] 1,15-18 * page 669 compound 1-4 * | [X] - KITAZAWA S ET AL, "LIPOPHILIC CROWN-4 DERIVATIVES AS LITHIUM IONOPHORES", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, (19840101), vol. 106, doi:10.1021/JA00335A019, ISSN 0002-7863, page 6978, XP001002383 [X] 1,15-18 * compound 1b page 6978 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja00335a019 | [X] - KIMURA K ET AL, "SYNTHESIS AND SELECTIVITY FOR LITHIUM OF LIPOPHILIC 14-CROWN-4 DERIVATIVES BEARING BULKY SUBSTITUENTS OR AN ADDITIONAL BINDING SITE IN THE SIDE ARM", JOURNAL OF THE CHEMICAL SOCIETY , PERKIN TRANSACTIONS 2, CHEMICAL SOCIETY , LETCHWORTH, GB, (19860101), doi:10.1039/P29860001945, ISSN 1472-779X, pages 1945 - 1951, XP001002381 [X] 1,15-18 * page 1947 compounds 14-19 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/p29860001945 | [X] - KEIICHI KIMURA ET AL, "Ion selectivity of 14-crown-4 derivative possessing two potential anionic sites on extraction of alkali and alkaline-earth metal ions", BULLETIN OF THE CHEMICAL SOCIETY OF JAPAN, (19870730), vol. 60, no. 8, pages 3068 - 3070, XP055955708 [X] 1,15-18 * compound 7 page 3068 * | [X] - KATAKY R ET AL, "Comparative study of mono-and di-substituted 14-crown-4 derivatives as lithium lonophores", JOURNAL OF THE CHEMICAL SOCIETY, PERKIN TRANSACTIONS, GB, (19900101), vol. 2, no. 2, ISSN 0300-9580, pages 321 - 327, XP055955734 [X] 1,15-18 * compounds 10-16 page 321 * | [X] - RYUHEI WAKITA ET AL, "Synthesis of methyl-substituted lariat ethers containing a 13-crown-4 ring", JOURNAL OF HETEROCYCLIC CHEMISTRY, (19900701), vol. 27, no. 5, pages 1337 - 1339, XP055955746 [X] 1 * page 1337 compounds 2a-2c * | [X] - TOBE YOSHITO ET AL, "Synthesis and lithium ion selectivity of 14-crown-4 derivatives having bulky subunits: cis and trans isomers of 2-phenylcyclohexano- 14-crown-4, 2,3-diphenylcyclohexano-14-crown-4 and 2,3-di-(1-adamantyl)-14-crown-4", J. CHEM. SOC. PERKIN TRANS, (19980302), no. 3, pages 485 - 494, XP055955768 [X] 1 * page 485 compounds 1,2a,2b * | International search | [A]US4228253 (MARIE GILBERT) [A] 1* ; column 5, lines 15-20 *; | [A]US2005288346 (CUBE ROWENA V [US], et al) [A] 63/61/59-60, 64/63/61/59-60, 65/61/59-60 * ; paragraph [0206] *; | [Y]US7230123 (BARRE YVES [FR], et al) [Y] 75 * ; column 3, lines 25-40; column 14, lines 40-45 *; | [YA]US2007244308 (MORIGUCHI TETSUJI [JP]) [Y] 61/59-60 * ; abstract; paragraphs [0067], [0075] * [A] 63/61/59-60, 64/63/61/59-60, 65/61/59-60; | [A]US2009239829 (ROSSELLO ARMANDO [IT], et al) [A] 63/61/59-60, 64/63/61/59-60, 65/61/59-60 * ; paragraph [0301] *; | [XYA]US2016280678 (CHUNG WOOK-JIN [KR], et al) [X] 1-2, 3/1-2, 33-34, 36/33-34, 59-60 * ; abstract, paragraph [0032] * [Y] 61/59-60, 75 [A] 63/61/59-60, 64/63/61/59-60, 65/61/59-60; | [X]US2018159132 (GONSER ANDREAS [DE], et al) [X] 1-2, 4/1-2, 33, 35, 36/33, 33/35, 37 * ; paragraphs [0149]-[0150] * |