EP3875997 - DIELECTRIC FILM, METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME AND OPTICAL MEMBER USING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.12.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.08.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.07.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KONICA MINOLTA, INC. 2-7-2, Marunouchi Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-7015 / JP | [2021/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KASUYA, Jinichi c/o KONICA MINOLTA, INC., 2-7-2, Marunouchi, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-7015 / JP | 02 /
TADA, Kazunari c/o KONICA MINOLTA, INC., 2-7-2, Marunouchi, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-7015 / JP | [2021/36] | Representative(s) | Gille Hrabal Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Patentanwälte Brucknerstraße 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | [2021/36] | Application number, filing date | 19900306.2 | 31.10.2019 | [2021/36] | WO2019JP42794 | Priority number, date | JP20180239799 | 21.12.2018 Original published format: JP 2018239799 | [2021/36] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020129424 | Date: | 25.06.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3875997 | Date: | 08.09.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 25.06.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.02.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G02B1/113, B32B9/00, C23C14/08, C23C14/10, G02B1/14, G02B1/16, G02B1/18, G02B27/00, C23C14/30, C23C14/22 | [2022/09] | CPC: |
C23C14/081 (EP,US);
C23C14/10 (EP,US);
C23C14/024 (US);
C23C14/083 (EP,US);
C23C14/221 (EP);
C23C14/30 (EP,US);
C23C14/34 (US);
G02B1/113 (EP);
G02B1/115 (US);
G02B1/14 (EP);
G02B1/16 (EP);
G02B1/18 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2021/36] | G02B1/113, B32B9/00, C23C14/08, C23C14/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/36] | Title | German: | DIELEKTRISCHE SCHICHT, VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAVON UND OPTISCHES ELEMENT MIT VERWENDUNG DAVON | [2021/36] | English: | DIELECTRIC FILM, METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME AND OPTICAL MEMBER USING SAME | [2021/36] | French: | FILM DIÉLECTRIQUE, SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION ET ÉLÉMENT OPTIQUE FAISANT APPEL À CELUI-CI | [2021/36] | Entry into regional phase | 31.05.2021 | Translation filed | 31.05.2021 | National basic fee paid | 31.05.2021 | Search fee paid | 31.05.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.05.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.05.2021 | Examination requested [2021/36] | 22.08.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.12.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.04.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]JP2001033607 (TOTO LTD); | [Y]JP2002338306 (TOHPE CORP, et al); | [XY]JP2018197171 (HOYA CORP); | [PA]JP2019002036 (TAKACHIHO KK, et al) | by applicant | JP2000160331 | JP2004068109 | JP2013047361 | JP2013203774 |