EP3901575 - LEVEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.04.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.05.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.12.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.09.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.07.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CH | published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wako Electric Co., Ltd. 81, Amaike, Jogairicho Anjo-shi Aichi 444-1206 / JP | [2021/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SAKAKIBARA, Yoshiya c/o WAKO ELECTRIC CO., LTD. 81, Amaike, Jogairicho Anjo-shi Aichi 444-1206 / JP | [2021/43] | Representative(s) | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [2021/43] | Application number, filing date | 19900569.5 | 24.09.2019 | [2021/43] | WO2019JP37172 | Priority number, date | JP20180239368 | 21.12.2018 Original published format: JP 2018239368 | [2021/43] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020129339 | Date: | 25.06.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3901575 | Date: | 27.10.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3901575 | Date: | 07.06.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 25.06.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.12.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G01C9/04, G01C9/06 | [2022/46] | CPC: |
G01C9/04 (EP,KR);
G01C9/06 (EP,KR,US);
G01C2009/066 (EP,KR,US)
|
Former IPC [2022/04] | G01C9/00, G01C9/04, G01C9/06 | ||
Former IPC [2021/43] | G01C9/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/43] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WASSERWAAGE | [2021/43] | English: | LEVEL | [2021/43] | French: | NIVEAU | [2021/43] | Entry into regional phase | 02.07.2021 | Translation filed | 02.07.2021 | National basic fee paid | 02.07.2021 | Search fee paid | 02.07.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.07.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.07.2021 | Examination requested [2021/43] | 04.03.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.12.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.03.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 27.03.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.03.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 08.03.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 07.06.2023 | ES | 07.06.2023 | HR | 07.06.2023 | MC | 07.06.2023 | PL | 07.06.2023 | RO | 07.06.2023 | RS | 07.06.2023 | SK | 07.06.2023 | SM | 07.06.2023 | NO | 07.09.2023 | GR | 08.09.2023 | GB | 24.09.2023 | IE | 24.09.2023 | CH | 30.09.2023 | IS | 07.10.2023 | [2024/34] |
Former [2024/33] | CZ | 07.06.2023 | |
ES | 07.06.2023 | ||
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
MC | 07.06.2023 | ||
PL | 07.06.2023 | ||
RO | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
GB | 24.09.2023 | ||
IE | 24.09.2023 | ||
IS | 07.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/28] | CZ | 07.06.2023 | |
ES | 07.06.2023 | ||
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
MC | 07.06.2023 | ||
PL | 07.06.2023 | ||
RO | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
IS | 07.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | CZ | 07.06.2023 | |
ES | 07.06.2023 | ||
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
PL | 07.06.2023 | ||
RO | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
IS | 07.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 07.06.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [XAYI]US5479715 (SCHULTHEIS GARY R [US], et al) [X] 1 * figures 1A-D, 2A * * column 3, line 58 - line 62 * [A] 4 [Y] 3 [I] 2; | [X]US5488779 (SCHULTHEIS GARY R [US], et al) [X] 1,4 * column 2, line 63 - column 3, line 21 * * column 1, line 48 - line 61 * * figure 1 *; | [A]US2006064888 (CHEN TIMMY [TW]) [A] 1-4* figures 2,4 *; | [Y]JP2009092526 (AKEBONO BRAKE IND) [Y] 3 * paragraphs [0022] , [0 23] * | International search | [XYA]US5479715 (SCHULTHEIS GARY R [US], et al) [X] 1 * , * [Y] 3-4 [A] 2; | [YA]JPH08501152 [Y] 4 * , *[A] 2; | [YA]JP2009092526 (AKEBONO BRAKE IND) [Y] 3-4 * , * [A] 2 | by applicant | JPH08501152 | JP2002048538 | JP2014055872 | JP3214943U |