EP3882690 - ELECTRONIC DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2021/38] | LIQUID CRYSTAL DISPLAY SCREEN, ELECTRONIC DEVICE, AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING LIQUID CRYSTAL DISPLAY SCREEN | ||
[2023/31] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.01.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.08.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.08.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.07.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2021/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MA, Lei Huawei Administration Building, Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
WANG, Peng Huawei Administration Building, Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 03 /
XIAO, Guangnan Huawei Administration Building, Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 04 /
ZHANG, Feng Huawei Administration Building, Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 05 /
SU, Binbin Huawei Administration Building, Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2021/38] | Representative(s) | Maiwald GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | [2024/06] |
Former [2021/38] | Maiwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 19900816.0 | 02.12.2019 | [2021/38] | WO2019CN122319 | Priority number, date | CN201811565388 | 20.12.2018 Original published format: CN201811565388 | [2021/38] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020125387 | Date: | 25.06.2020 | Language: | ZH | [2020/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3882690 | Date: | 22.09.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3882690 | Date: | 07.02.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 25.06.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.01.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G02F1/1333, G02F1/13357, H04M1/02, G06F1/16 | [2022/04] | CPC: |
G02F1/133512 (EP,US);
G02F1/1333 (CN);
G02B6/0088 (US);
G02F1/133308 (US);
G02F1/133388 (US);
G02F1/1335 (CN);
G02F1/133528 (CN,US);
G02F1/1336 (CN);
G02F1/133608 (CN);
G02F1/133615 (EP);
G06F1/1637 (EP);
G06F1/1686 (EP);
H04M1/0264 (EP);
H04M1/026 (EP);
H04M1/0266 (EP);
H04M2250/12 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2021/38] | G02F1/1333 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/38] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG | [2023/31] | English: | ELECTRONIC DEVICE | [2023/31] | French: | DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE | [2023/31] |
Former [2021/38] | FLÜSSIGKRISTALLANZEIGESCHIRM, ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES FLÜSSIGKRISTALLANZEIGESCHIRMS | ||
Former [2021/38] | LIQUID CRYSTAL DISPLAY SCREEN, ELECTRONIC DEVICE, AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING LIQUID CRYSTAL DISPLAY SCREEN | ||
Former [2021/38] | ÉCRAN D'AFFICHAGE À CRISTAUX LIQUIDES, DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE, PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'ÉCRAN À CRISTAUX LIQUIDES | Entry into regional phase | 18.06.2021 | Translation filed | 18.06.2021 | National basic fee paid | 18.06.2021 | Search fee paid | 18.06.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.06.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.06.2021 | Examination requested [2021/38] | 10.05.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.08.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.11.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 08.11.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.11.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 07.02.2024 | BG | 07.02.2024 | ES | 07.02.2024 | FI | 07.02.2024 | HR | 07.02.2024 | LT | 07.02.2024 | LV | 07.02.2024 | NL | 07.02.2024 | PL | 07.02.2024 | SE | 07.02.2024 | NO | 07.05.2024 | RS | 07.05.2024 | GR | 08.05.2024 | IS | 07.06.2024 | PT | 07.06.2024 | [2024/37] |
Former [2024/36] | AT | 07.02.2024 | |
BG | 07.02.2024 | ||
ES | 07.02.2024 | ||
FI | 07.02.2024 | ||
HR | 07.02.2024 | ||
LT | 07.02.2024 | ||
LV | 07.02.2024 | ||
NL | 07.02.2024 | ||
PL | 07.02.2024 | ||
NO | 07.05.2024 | ||
RS | 07.05.2024 | ||
GR | 08.05.2024 | ||
IS | 07.06.2024 | ||
PT | 07.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | AT | 07.02.2024 | |
BG | 07.02.2024 | ||
ES | 07.02.2024 | ||
FI | 07.02.2024 | ||
HR | 07.02.2024 | ||
LT | 07.02.2024 | ||
NL | 07.02.2024 | ||
NO | 07.05.2024 | ||
RS | 07.05.2024 | ||
GR | 08.05.2024 | ||
IS | 07.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | BG | 07.02.2024 | |
FI | 07.02.2024 | ||
HR | 07.02.2024 | ||
LT | 07.02.2024 | ||
NL | 07.02.2024 | ||
NO | 07.05.2024 | ||
RS | 07.05.2024 | ||
GR | 08.05.2024 | ||
IS | 07.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | LT | 07.02.2024 | |
NO | 07.05.2024 | ||
IS | 07.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | IS | 07.06.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CN108957829 (OPPO GUANGDONG MOBILE COMMUNICATIONS CO LTD) [A] 1-4 * paragraphs [0030] , [0037] ** figures 1,3,5,7,9 *; | [IA]CN108989508 (OPPO CHONGQING INTELLIGENT TECH CO LTD) [I] 1,2,4 * paragraph [0051] - paragraph [0059] * * paragraph [0068] - paragraph [0075] * * figures 5,8,9,16 * [A] 3 | Examination | CN108873473 |