EP3900591 - ROBOT CLEANER, CLEANING METHOD AND AUTOMATICALLY CHARGING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.09.2021 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.07.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.11.2023 | Change - representative | 24.11.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Positec Power Tools (Suzhou) Co., Ltd (Non-Small Entity) No. 18 Dongwang Road Industrial Park Suzhou, Jiangsu 215123 / CN | [2021/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHANG, Shisong No. 18 Dongwang Road, Industrial Park Suzhou, Jiangsu 215123 / CN | 02 /
WU, Hongbing No. 18 Dongwang Road, Industrial Park Suzhou, Jiangsu 215123 / CN | 03 /
XIE, Mingjian No. 18 Dongwang Road, Industrial Park Suzhou, Jiangsu 215123 / CN | 04 /
XU, Jianqiang No. 18 Dongwang Road, Industrial Park Suzhou, Jiangsu 215123 / CN | 05 /
ZHONG, Hongfeng No. 18 Dongwang Road, Industrial Park Suzhou, Jiangsu 215123 / CN | 06 /
LI, Ji No. 18 Dongwang Road, Industrial Park Suzhou, Jiangsu 215123 / CN | [2021/43] | Representative(s) | Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road Holborn London WC1X 8NL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/43] | Dentons UK and Middle East LLP One Fleet Place London EC4M 7WS / GB | Application number, filing date | 19900841.8 | 10.12.2019 | [2021/43] | WO2019CN124279 | Priority number, date | CN201811572154 | 21.12.2018 Original published format: CN201811572154 | CN201910250295 | 29.03.2019 Original published format: CN201910250295 | [2021/43] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020125492 | Date: | 25.06.2020 | Language: | ZH | [2020/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3900591 | Date: | 27.10.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 25.06.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.08.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A47L9/00, A47L11/40, A47L9/28, A47L11/284 | [2022/38] | CPC: |
A47L5/24 (EP);
A47L11/4055 (EP,KR);
A47L11/28 (CN);
A47L11/4011 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A47L11/284 (EP);
A47L11/40 (CN);
A47L11/4002 (KR);
A47L11/4005 (KR,US);
A47L11/4036 (KR,US);
A47L11/4063 (KR);
A47L11/4066 (CN);
A47L11/4069 (CN);
A47L11/4083 (EP);
A47L11/4091 (KR,US);
A47L9/2826 (EP);
A47L9/2884 (EP);
H02J7/0048 (KR);
A47L2201/00 (CN);
A47L2201/022 (KR,US);
A47L2201/028 (EP,KR,US);
A47L2201/04 (CN,KR);
A47L2201/06 (EP,CN)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2021/43] | A47L9/00, A47L11/40, H02J7/00, H02J11/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/43] | Title | German: | REINIGUNGSROBOTER, REINIGUNGSVERFAHREN UND AUTOMATISCHES LADESYSTEM | [2021/43] | English: | ROBOT CLEANER, CLEANING METHOD AND AUTOMATICALLY CHARGING SYSTEM | [2021/43] | French: | ROBOT NETTOYEUR, DISPOSITIF ET SYSTÈME DE CHARGE AUTOMATIQUE | [2021/43] | Entry into regional phase | 23.06.2021 | Translation filed | 23.06.2021 | National basic fee paid | 23.06.2021 | Search fee paid | 23.06.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.06.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.06.2021 | Examination requested [2021/43] | 07.03.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]DE102016124684 (VORWERK CO INTERHOLDING [DE]) [Y] 1-4,8-10,12-15 * paragraph [0013]; figure 1 * * the whole document *[A] 6,7,11; | [YA]WO2018202301 (KAERCHER ALFRED SE & CO KG [DE]) [Y] 1-4,8-10,12-15 * page 2, paragraph last - page 3, line last line * * the whole document * [A] 6,7,11; | [YA]WO2018217226 (IROBOT CORP [US]) [Y] 1-4,8-10,12-15 * page 11, paragraph last - page 12, line 10 * * the whole document * [A] 6,7,11; | [XAI]US2018361585 (WILLIAMS LARRY J [US], et al) [X] 1-4,8-10,12-15 * paragraph [0097] - paragraph [0107] * * the whole document * [A] 6,7,11 [I] 5 |