EP3900718 - AGENT FOR IMPROVING MUSCLE QUALITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.03.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.09.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.07.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AJINOMOTO CO., INC. 15-1, Kyobashi 1-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8315 / JP | [2021/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MIURA, Kyoko c/o AJINOMOTO CO., INC., 1-1, Suzuki-cho, Kawasaki-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 210-8681 / JP | 02 /
NAKAZAWA, Mai c/o AJINOMOTO CO., INC., 1-1, Suzuki-cho, Kawasaki-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 210-8681 / JP | 03 /
KITAHARA, Yoshiro c/o AJINOMOTO CO., INC., 1-1, Suzuki-cho, Kawasaki-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 210-8681 / JP | [2021/43] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2021/43] | Application number, filing date | 19900986.1 | 20.12.2019 | [2021/43] | WO2019JP50188 | Priority number, date | JP20180240020 | 21.12.2018 Original published format: JP 2018240020 | [2021/43] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020130146 | Date: | 25.06.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3900718 | Date: | 27.10.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 25.06.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.07.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/198, A61P21/00, A23L33/175 | [2022/34] | CPC: |
A23L33/175 (EP,US);
A61K31/198 (EP,US);
A61P21/00 (EP);
A23V2002/00 (EP)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/198, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A23V2002/00, A23V2200/316 (EP) |
Former IPC [2021/43] | A61K31/198, A61P21/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/43] | Title | German: | MITTEL ZUR VERBESSERUNG DER MUSKELQUALITÄT | [2021/43] | English: | AGENT FOR IMPROVING MUSCLE QUALITY | [2021/43] | French: | AGENT DESTINÉ À AMÉLIORER LA QUALITÉ MUSCULAIRE | [2021/43] | Entry into regional phase | 02.07.2021 | Translation filed | 02.07.2021 | National basic fee paid | 02.07.2021 | Search fee paid | 02.07.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.07.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.07.2021 | Examination requested [2021/43] | 17.02.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.03.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.09.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2013175266 (CHEMI NUTRA INC [US], et al); | [XI]US2014205710 (JANOW DAVID [US]); | [X]WO2014191856 (NESTEC SA [CH]) | International search | [A]WO2015133627 (AJINOMOTO KK [JP]); | [XY]JP2016014007 (KAO CORP); | by applicant | JP20180240020 |