EP3902393 - DRAGGING APPARATUS WITH RIPPER SHANK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 19.05.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.10.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.07.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.05.2023 | Withdrawal of application | published on 21.06.2023 [2023/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CASHMAN DREDGING & MARINE CONTRACTING CO., LLC 549 South Street Quincy, MA 02169 / US | [2021/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CASHMAN, Jay 315 Darmouth Street Boston, MA 02126 / US | 02 /
BELESIMO, Frank 26 Scotch Dam Road Easton, MA 02375 / US | 03 /
HORAN, Aiden 19 Victoria Drive Hampton Falls, NH 03844 / US | 04 /
MANNERING, Timothy 215 Highland Street Marshfield, MA 02050 / US | 05 /
BOURQUE, Norman 23 Herring Brook Lane Rochester, MA 02770 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2021/44] | 01 /
CASHMAN, Jay Boston, MA 02126 / US | ||
02 /
BELESIMO, Frank Easton, MA 02375 / US | |||
03 /
HORAN, Aiden Hampton Falls, NH 03844 / US | |||
04 /
MANNERING, Timothy Marshfield, MA 02050 / US | |||
05 /
BOURQUE, Norman Rochester, MA 02770 / US | Representative(s) | Maidment, Marc, et al Albright IP Limited County House Bayshill Road Cheltenham, Glos. GL50 3BA / GB | [2021/44] | Application number, filing date | 19901552.0 | 23.12.2019 | [2021/44] | WO2019US68250 | Priority number, date | US201862784973P | 26.12.2018 Original published format: US 201862784973 P | [2021/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020139804 | Date: | 02.07.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3902393 | Date: | 03.11.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.07.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 02.07.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.09.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A01K80/00, E02F3/04, E02F3/80, E02F3/46, E02F3/48, E02F5/00, E02F5/28, E02F5/32, E02F9/28, E02F3/88, E02F3/90, E02F3/92, E02F9/06, E02F9/20 | [2022/44] | CPC: |
E02F9/2041 (EP,US);
E02F3/815 (US);
E02F3/8875 (EP);
E02F3/907 (EP,US);
E02F3/9212 (EP);
E02F5/006 (US);
E02F5/32 (EP);
E02F9/062 (EP);
E02F9/2875 (EP,US);
E02F5/285 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2021/44] | A01K80/00, E02F3/04, E02F3/80, E02F3/46, E02F3/48, E02F5/00, E02F5/28, E02F5/32, E02F9/28 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/44] | Title | German: | SCHLEPPVORRICHTUNG MIT TRENNSCHAFT | [2021/44] | English: | DRAGGING APPARATUS WITH RIPPER SHANK | [2021/44] | French: | APPAREIL DE TRACTION AVEC TIGE DE DÉFONCEUSE | [2021/44] | Entry into regional phase | 22.06.2021 | National basic fee paid | 22.06.2021 | Search fee paid | 22.06.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.06.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.06.2021 | Examination requested [2021/44] | 10.05.2023 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2023/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US449184 (D.H. SOLOMON) [Y] 14-16 * abstract *; | [Y]GB1352570 (WATASE M Y) [Y] 1,5,6,17,18 * abstract *; | [Y]JPS53111501U (UNKNOWN) [Y] 1,5-7,17,18 * figures 1,2,6-9 *; | [XYI]GB2300014 (JONG ARJAN SCOTT DE [GB]) [X] 1,8-12,17,18 * the whole document * [Y] 1-7,14-18 [I] 13,19,20; | [Y]WO0165014 (BHP INNOVATION PTY LTD [AU], et al) [Y] 1-6,17,18 * abstract *; | [Y]US2008197615 (CONNOLLY MICHAEL R [US]) [Y] 16* abstract * | International search | [XY]US449184 (SOLOMON, D.) [X] 1, 6-12, 14-15, 17-18 * ; figure 1-3; page 1, lines 80-90 * [Y] 2-5, 13, 16, 19-20; | [X]US546181 (NIELSEN, M.) [X] 1-4, 6-8, 14-16 * ; figure 1-3; page 1, lines 55-65 *; | [Y]US2100956 (HEMMERT FRANK B) [Y] 2-5 * ; figure 2, 8 *; | [Y]US4902038 (GROVER BRUCE D [US]) [Y] 16* ; figure 1; column 4, lines 10-15 *; | [Y]US6116818 (BITETTO JAMES J [US], et al) [Y] 13, 19-20 * ; figure 6; column 5, lines 15-23 * |