EP3903958 - COILING MACHINE AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING COIL SPRING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2021/44] | COILING MACHINE, METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING COIL SPRING, AND COIL SPRING | ||
[2023/37] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.12.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.08.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.10.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.07.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NHK Spring Co., Ltd. 3-10, Fukuura Kanazawa-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 236-0004 / JP | [2021/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FURUSE, Takeshi c/o NHK SPRING CO., LTD., 3-10, Fukuura, Kanazawa- ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 236-0004 / JP | 02 /
HAGIWARA, Daiki c/o NHK SPRING CO., LTD., 3-10, Fukuura, Kanazawa- ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 236-0004 / JP | 03 /
SATO, Takuya c/o NHK SPRING CO., LTD., 3-10, Fukuura, Kanazawa- ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 236-0004 / JP | 04 /
YAMAUCHI, Yuichiro c/o NHK SPRING CO., LTD., 3-10, Fukuura, Kanazawa- ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 236-0004 / JP | [2024/04] |
Former [2021/44] | 01 /
FURUSE, Takeshi Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 236-0004 / JP | ||
02 /
HAGIWARA, Daiki Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 236-0004 / JP | |||
03 /
SATO, Takuya Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 236-0004 / JP | |||
04 /
YAMAUCHI, Yuichiro Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 236-0004 / JP | Representative(s) | AWA Sweden AB Junkersgatan 1 582 35 Linköping / SE | [2021/44] | Application number, filing date | 19901655.1 | 26.12.2019 | [2021/44] | WO2019JP51329 | Priority number, date | JP20180246709 | 28.12.2018 Original published format: JP 2018246709 | [2021/44] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020138376 | Date: | 02.07.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3903958 | Date: | 03.11.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3903958 | Date: | 24.01.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 02.07.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.09.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B21F3/02, B21F3/06, B21F11/00, B21F35/00 | [2021/44] | CPC: |
B21F3/04 (EP);
B21F3/06 (EP,US);
B21F11/005 (EP,US);
B21F3/02 (EP);
B21F35/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/44] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WICKELMASCHINE UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER SCHRAUBENFEDER | [2023/37] | English: | COILING MACHINE AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING COIL SPRING | [2023/37] | French: | MACHINE D'ENROULEMENT ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN RESSORT HÉLICOÏDAL | [2023/37] |
Former [2021/44] | WICKELMASCHINE, VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER SCHRAUBENFEDER UND SCHRAUBENFEDER | ||
Former [2021/44] | COILING MACHINE, METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING COIL SPRING, AND COIL SPRING | ||
Former [2021/44] | MACHINE D'ENROULEMENT, PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN RESSORT HÉLICOÏDAL ET RESSORT HÉLICOÏDAL | Entry into regional phase | 27.06.2021 | Translation filed | 27.06.2021 | National basic fee paid | 27.06.2021 | Search fee paid | 27.06.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.06.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.06.2021 | Examination requested [2021/44] | 20.03.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.08.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.12.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 12.12.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.12.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 24.01.2024 | BG | 24.01.2024 | FI | 24.01.2024 | HR | 24.01.2024 | LT | 24.01.2024 | LV | 24.01.2024 | NL | 24.01.2024 | PL | 24.01.2024 | SE | 24.01.2024 | NO | 24.04.2024 | RS | 24.04.2024 | GR | 25.04.2024 | IS | 24.05.2024 | PT | 24.05.2024 | [2024/37] |
Former [2024/36] | AT | 24.01.2024 | |
BG | 24.01.2024 | ||
FI | 24.01.2024 | ||
HR | 24.01.2024 | ||
LT | 24.01.2024 | ||
LV | 24.01.2024 | ||
NL | 24.01.2024 | ||
PL | 24.01.2024 | ||
NO | 24.04.2024 | ||
RS | 24.04.2024 | ||
GR | 25.04.2024 | ||
IS | 24.05.2024 | ||
PT | 24.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | AT | 24.01.2024 | |
BG | 24.01.2024 | ||
FI | 24.01.2024 | ||
HR | 24.01.2024 | ||
LT | 24.01.2024 | ||
NL | 24.01.2024 | ||
NO | 24.04.2024 | ||
RS | 24.04.2024 | ||
GR | 25.04.2024 | ||
IS | 24.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | BG | 24.01.2024 | |
FI | 24.01.2024 | ||
HR | 24.01.2024 | ||
LT | 24.01.2024 | ||
NL | 24.01.2024 | ||
NO | 24.04.2024 | ||
RS | 24.04.2024 | ||
GR | 25.04.2024 | ||
IS | 24.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | LT | 24.01.2024 | |
NL | 24.01.2024 | ||
NO | 24.04.2024 | ||
IS | 24.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | NL | 24.01.2024 | |
IS | 24.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/31] | NL | 24.01.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPS501549U ; | [Y]JP2002273536 (CANON KK); | [Y]JP2003010937 (NIPPON PISTON RING CO LTD, et al); | [A]US2008302156 (ITAYA ICHIRO [JP]); | [A]WO2015007496 (WAFIOS AG [DE]); | [Y]KR101891936B | International search | [Y]FR1211009 (HELI COIL CORP); | [A]JPS6250028 (HIGH FREQUENCY HEATTREAT); | [Y]JP2003010937 (NIPPON PISTON RING CO LTD, et al); | [A]JP4317252B ; | [YA]JP2016155162 (NHK SPRING CO LTD); | [Y]WO2016208033 (ORII & MEC CORP [JP]); | [EA]JP2020032457 (NIPPON PISTON RING CO LTD, et al) | by applicant | JPS6250028 | JP4317252B |