EP3904965 - INFORMATION PROCESSING DEVICE, INFORMATION PROCESSING METHOD, INFORMATION PROCESSING PROGRAM, AND INFORMATION PROCESSING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.08.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.10.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.07.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Minami, Noriyuki 16-5 Fukuinekamitakamatsu-cho Higashiyama-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 605-0983 / JP | [2021/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OSUGA, Seiya 16-5 Fukuinekamitakamatsu-cho Higashiyama-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 605-0983 / JP | 02 /
TAKATORI, Junichi 16-5 Fukuinekamitakamatsu-cho Higashiyama-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 605-0983 / JP | 03 /
HATTORI, Sadayoshi 16-5 Fukuinekamitakamatsu-cho Higashiyama-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 605-0983 / JP | 04 /
YAMAKAWA, Shumpei 16-5 Fukuinekamitakamatsu-cho Higashiyama-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 605-0983 / JP | 05 /
MATSUDA, Yuki 16-5 Fukuinekamitakamatsu-cho Higashiyama-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 605-0983 / JP | 06 /
KONDO, Masahiro 16-5 Fukuinekamitakamatsu-cho Higashiyama-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 605-0983 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2021/44] | 01 /
OSUGA, Seiya Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 605-0983 / JP | ||
02 /
TAKATORI, Junichi Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 605-0983 / JP | |||
03 /
HATTORI, Sadayoshi Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 605-0983 / JP | |||
04 /
YAMAKAWA, Shumpei Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 605-0983 / JP | |||
05 /
MATSUDA, Yuki Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 605-0983 / JP | |||
06 /
KONDO, Masahiro Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 605-0983 / JP | Representative(s) | Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [2021/44] | Application number, filing date | 19902247.6 | 25.12.2019 | [2021/44] | WO2019IB61352 | Priority number, date | JP20180248120 | 28.12.2018 Original published format: JP 2018248120 | [2021/44] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020136591 | Date: | 02.07.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3904965 | Date: | 03.11.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 02.07.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.08.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G04B23/02, A61M21/00, A61B5/11, A61B5/16 | [2021/44] | CPC: |
A61B5/4809 (EP,US);
G08B21/06 (US);
A61B5/11 (EP);
A61B5/4812 (EP,US);
A61M21/02 (EP,US);
A61B5/16 (EP);
A61M2021/0027 (EP);
A61M2021/0083 (US);
A61M2205/18 (EP);
A61M2230/63 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/44] | Title | German: | INFORMATIONSVERARBEITUNGSVORRICHTUNG, INFORMATIONSVERARBEITUNGSVERFAHREN, INFORMATIONSVERARBEITUNGSPROGRAMM UND INFORMATIONSVERARBEITUNGSSYSTEM | [2021/44] | English: | INFORMATION PROCESSING DEVICE, INFORMATION PROCESSING METHOD, INFORMATION PROCESSING PROGRAM, AND INFORMATION PROCESSING SYSTEM | [2021/44] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT D'INFORMATIONS, PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT D'INFORMATIONS, PROGRAMME DE TRAITEMENT D'INFORMATIONS ET SYSTÈME DE TRAITEMENT D'INFORMATIONS | [2021/44] | Entry into regional phase | 25.06.2021 | Translation filed | 25.06.2021 | National basic fee paid | 25.06.2021 | Search fee paid | 25.06.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.06.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.06.2021 | Examination requested [2021/44] | 02.03.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.08.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]JP2013213642 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP); | [XA]US2014276119 (VENKATRAMAN SUBRAMANIAM [US], et al); | [XI]WO2015006364 (RESMED SENSOR TECHNOLOGIES LTD [IE], et al) | International search | [YA]JPH0627269 (SEIKOSHA KK); | [A]US2003095476 (MOLLICONE DANIEL JOSEPH [CA], et al); | [A]JP2017113263 (YAMAHA CORP); | [XYA]JP2017169933 (YAMAHA CORP); | [A]JP2018149076 (AIPHONE CO LTD) | by applicant | JP2014014708 |