06.09.2024 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] |
04.09.2024 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
04.09.2024 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
04.09.2024 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
03.06.2024 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
24.05.2024 |
Change - classification |
published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] |
24.05.2024 |
Change - classification |
published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] |
22.12.2023 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
23.12.2022 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
25.03.2022 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
04.03.2022 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 06.04.2022 [2022/14] |
04.03.2022 |
Change - extension states |
published on 06.04.2022 [2022/14] |
09.02.2022 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee |
|
09.02.2022 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
08.02.2022 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
13.01.2022 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 09.02.2022 [2022/06] |
07.01.2022 |
Change - classification |
published on 09.02.2022 [2022/06] |
07.01.2022 |
Change - classification |
published on 09.02.2022 [2022/06] |
03.09.2021 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 06.10.2021 [2021/40] |
03.09.2021 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 06.10.2021 [2021/40] |
21.07.2021 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
03.07.2021 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
02.07.2021 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
01.07.2021 |
Change - representative |
|
01.07.2021 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
04.07.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
04.07.2020 |
New entry: applicant or inventor |
|