EP3888987 - LANE SELECTION METHOD FOR VEHICLE WHEN SELF-DRIVING, SELECTION SYSTEM, AND VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.09.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.06.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.09.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.07.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Great Wall Motor Company Limited No.2266 Chaoyang South Ave. Baoding Hebei 071000 / CN | [2021/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WANG, Tianpei No. 2266 Chaoyang South Ave Baoding, Hebei 071000 / CN | 02 /
BU, Yushuai No. 2266 Chaoyang South Ave Baoding, Hebei 071000 / CN | 03 /
GE, Jianyong No. 2266 Chaoyang South Ave Baoding, Hebei 071000 / CN | 04 /
ZHANG, Kai No. 2266 Chaoyang South Ave Baoding, Hebei 071000 / CN | 05 /
ZHEN, Longbao No. 2266 Chaoyang South Ave Baoding, Hebei 071000 / CN | 06 /
HE, Lin No. 2266 Chaoyang South Ave Baoding, Hebei 071000 / CN | 07 /
REN, Yaxing No. 2266 Chaoyang South Ave Baoding, Hebei 071000 / CN | 08 /
QIN, Chuang No. 2266 Chaoyang South Ave Baoding, Hebei 071000 / CN | 09 /
GAO, Shasha No. 2266 Chaoyang South Ave Baoding, Hebei 071000 / CN | 10 /
ZHANG, Lu No. 2266 Chaoyang South Ave Baoding, Hebei 071000 / CN | [2021/40] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [2021/40] | Application number, filing date | 19902543.8 | 30.12.2019 | [2021/40] | WO2019CN130060 | Priority number, date | CN201811638303 | 29.12.2018 Original published format: CN201811638303 | [2021/40] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020135880 | Date: | 02.07.2020 | Language: | ZH | [2020/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3888987 | Date: | 06.10.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3888987 | Date: | 09.10.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 02.07.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.01.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B60W30/095, B60W40/02, B60W40/06, B60W30/18, B60W60/00 | [2022/06] | CPC: |
B60W30/18163 (EP);
B60W30/095 (CN);
B60W30/18154 (EP);
B60W40/02 (CN);
B60W40/06 (CN);
B60W60/001 (EP);
B60W2552/05 (EP);
B60W2552/10 (EP);
B60W2552/53 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2021/40] | B60W30/095, B60W40/02, B60W40/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/40] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FAHRSPURAUSWAHLVERFAHREN FÜR EIN FAHRZEUG IM AUTONOMEN FAHRBETRIEB, AUSWAHLSYSTEM UND FAHRZEUG | [2021/40] | English: | LANE SELECTION METHOD FOR VEHICLE WHEN SELF-DRIVING, SELECTION SYSTEM, AND VEHICLE | [2021/40] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE SÉLECTION DE VOIE POUR VÉHICULE LORS D'UN AUTO-PILOTAGE, SYSTÈME DE SÉLECTION ET VÉHICULE | [2021/40] | Entry into regional phase | 30.06.2021 | Translation filed | 30.06.2021 | National basic fee paid | 30.06.2021 | Search fee paid | 30.06.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.06.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.06.2021 | Examination requested [2021/40] | 22.03.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.06.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.09.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 04.09.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.09.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2021 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   08.02.2022 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2018170327 (LEE TAEYOUNG [KR], et al) [A] 1-11* the whole document *; | [I]WO2018132608 (MOBILEYE VISION TECHNOLOGIES LTD [IL]) [I] 1-11 * paragraphs [0135.0141] , [0145] , [0154] , [0175] , [0222] , [0242] - [0243] - [0247]; figures 11D,12, * * paragraphs [0260] , [0297] , [0301] , [0343] *; | [I]US2018253975 (MIZUTANI AKIRA [JP]) [I] 1-11 * figure 3 * * paragraphs [0047] - [0048] - [0053] , [0059] , [0091] *; | [A]CN108583578 (BEIJING LEADGENTECH CO LTD) [A] 1-11 * the whole document * |