EP3897998 - PROGRAMMABLE TANK CLEANING NOZZLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.05.2024 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.11.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.09.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.07.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.05.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Agi Engineering, Inc. 1325 El Pinal Drive Unit 7 Stockton, CA 95205 / US | [2021/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
INNES, Alexander G. 778 Metler Road Lodi, CA 95242 / US | [2024/23] |
Former [2021/43] | 01 /
INNES, Alexander, G. 778 Metler Road Lodi, CA 95242 / US | Representative(s) | MacLachlan & Donaldson Unit 10, 4075 Kingswood Road Citywest Business Campus Dublin D24 C56E / IE | [2021/43] | Application number, filing date | 19903056.0 | 23.12.2019 | [2021/43] | WO2019US68359 | Priority number, date | US201862784512P | 23.12.2018 Original published format: US 201862784512 P | US201916437796 | 11.06.2019 Original published format: US201916437796 | [2021/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020139839 | Date: | 02.07.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3897998 | Date: | 27.10.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.07.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 02.07.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.01.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B05B3/12, B05B15/72, B08B9/093, B08B9/08 | [2022/08] | CPC: |
B08B9/0933 (EP);
B05B3/0445 (EP);
B05B3/049 (EP);
B08B9/0813 (EP);
B08B9/0936 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2021/43] | B05B3/12, B05B15/72, B08B9/093 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/43] | Title | German: | PROGRAMMIERBARE TANKREINIGUNGSDÜSE | [2021/43] | English: | PROGRAMMABLE TANK CLEANING NOZZLE | [2021/43] | French: | BUSE PROGRAMMABLE DE NETTOYAGE DE RÉSERVOIR | [2021/43] | Entry into regional phase | 22.06.2021 | National basic fee paid | 22.06.2021 | Search fee paid | 22.06.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.06.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.06.2021 | Examination requested [2021/43] | 03.08.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.11.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.02.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.05.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2022 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   09.02.2023 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5092523 (RUCKER JON A [US], et al); | [XAI]US2008142042 (BRAMSEN FRANKLIN ERIK [US]); | [XI]WO2012150541 (ADROC TECH S R O [SK], et al); | [XA]US2017173617 (ZILAI MICHAEL SHAWN [US], et al); | [A]US2017259309 (INNES ALEXANDER G [US], et al) | International search | [Y]US3095044 (MEDLOCK JOHN P) [Y] 16 * ; column 1, lines 37-41; column 2, lines 38-47 column 7, lines 46-51 *; | [Y]US3757697 (PHINNEY E) [Y] 5 * ; figure 1; column 2, lines 30-41; column 3, Nines 17-22; column 4, lines 27-56 *; | [Y]US3863844 (MCMILLAN CLYDE H) [Y] 6, 8 * ; column 2, lines 59-64; column 3, lines 16-26; column 7, lines 46-51 *; | [Y]US4540869 (YASUOKA HIROTOSHI [JP]) [Y] 12 * ; figures 7-12; column 4, line 50-62 *; | [Y]US5740821 (ARNOLD KERMIT R [US]) [Y] 9 * ; column 1, lines 60-66; column 3, lines 44-48 *; | [Y]US6273790 (NEESE EDWARD D [US], et al) [Y] 8 * ; column 3, lines 55-66; column 6, lines 31-59 *; | [Y]US2002002426 (BURKHARD ALAN W [US]) [Y] 11, 15 * ; abstract; paragraphs [0014], [0016] *; | [Y]US2012106882 (PONNOURADJOU ALEXIS [US], et al) [Y] 20* ; paragraphs [0004]-[0005], [0020] *; | [Y]US2015124242 (PIERCE TRAVIS [US], et al) [Y] 10 * ; paragraphs [0019], [0031], [0051] *; | [Y]US2016055268 (BELL MATTHEW TSCHUDY [US], et al) [Y] 13-14 * ; figure 1; paragraphs [0004], [0025], [0027], [0030], [0064] *; | [XY]US2017173617 (ZILAI MICHAEL SHAWN [US], et al) [X] 1-4, 17-19 * ; figures 1, 2, 5A, 6, 8A-8B, 12A-12C, 13A-13C; paragraphs [0007], [0011], [0058], [0060], [0063], [0065], [0083], [0087]-[0088], [0097]-[0098], [0105]-[0107] * [Y] 5-16, 20; | [Y]US2017259309 (INNES ALEXANDER G [US], et al) [Y] 1, 6-8, 20 * ; figures 1A-F, 5B, 8; paragraphs [0002], [0010], [0015], [0114]-[0120], [0142], [0148] *; | [Y] - PEARSON, MJ et al., "Biomimetic vibrissal sensing for robots", Phil. Trans. R. Soc. B, (20110000), vol. 366, pages 3085 - 3096, XP055721145 [Y] 12 * ; abstract- * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1098/rstb.2011.0164 | by applicant | US2008142042 | WO2012150541 | US2017173617 |