EP3903705 - ELECTROPHYSIOLOGICAL CATHETER AND ABLATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.12.2023 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.10.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.07.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.04.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shanghai Microport Ep Medtech Co., Ltd. Building 28 No. 1-28 Lane 588 Tianxiong Road Zhoupu Town, Pudong New Area Shanghai 201318 / CN | [2021/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHANG, Zhaohua Building 28, No.1-28 Lane 588, Tianxiong Road, ZhoupuTown, Pudong New Area Shanghai 201318 / CN | 02 /
LIANG, Bo Building 28, No.1-28 Lane 588, Tianxiong Road, ZhoupuTown, Pudong New Area Shanghai 201318 / CN | 03 /
SUN, Yiyong Building 28, No.1-28 Lane 588, Tianxiong Road, ZhoupuTown, Pudong New Area Shanghai 201318 / CN | 04 /
SHEN, Liuping Building 28, No.1-28 Lane 588, Tianxiong Road, ZhoupuTown, Pudong New Area Shanghai 201318 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2021/44] | 01 /
CHANG, Zhaohua Shanghai 201318 / CN | ||
02 /
LIANG, Bo Shanghai 201318 / CN | |||
03 /
SUN, Yiyong Shanghai 201318 / CN | |||
04 /
SHEN, Liuping Shanghai 201318 / CN | Representative(s) | Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/44] | Dauncey, Mark Peter Marks & Clerk LLP 1 New York Street Manchester M1 4HD / GB | Application number, filing date | 19903360.6 | 15.11.2019 | [2021/44] | WO2019CN118882 | Priority number, date | CN201811653052 | 28.12.2018 Original published format: CN201811653052 | [2021/44] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020134683 | Date: | 02.07.2020 | Language: | ZH | [2020/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3903705 | Date: | 03.11.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 02.07.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.01.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61B18/02, A61B18/04, // A61B18/14 | [2022/08] | CPC: |
A61B18/1492 (EP);
A61B18/02 (EP,CN,US);
A61B18/04 (EP,CN,US);
A61B18/082 (EP);
A61B2018/0022 (EP,CN,US);
A61B2018/00351 (EP,CN,US);
A61B2018/00434 (CN);
A61B2018/00577 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00642 (CN);
A61B2018/00714 (CN,US);
A61B2018/00797 (EP,CN,US);
A61B2018/00916 (US);
A61B2018/00994 (EP);
A61B2018/0212 (EP,CN,US);
A61B2018/0262 (EP,CN);
|
Former IPC [2021/44] | A61B18/02, A61B18/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/44] | Title | German: | ELEKTROPHYSIOLOGISCHER KATHETER UND ABLATIONSSYSTEM | [2021/44] | English: | ELECTROPHYSIOLOGICAL CATHETER AND ABLATION SYSTEM | [2021/44] | French: | CATHÉTER ÉLECTROPHYSIOLOGIQUE ET SYSTÈME D'ABLATION | [2021/44] | Entry into regional phase | 14.07.2021 | Translation filed | 14.07.2021 | National basic fee paid | 14.07.2021 | Search fee paid | 14.07.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.07.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.07.2021 | Examination requested [2021/44] | 17.08.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.12.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.04.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2004243119 (LANE MIRIAM [CA], et al) [Y] 1-15 * paragraph [0059] - paragraph [0061]; figures 8A,B * * paragraph [0069] * * paragraph [0055] - paragraph [0068]; figures 10a-b *; | [Y]WO2011142909 (BERZAK NIR [IL], et al) [Y] 1-5,7-15 * paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0029]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0035]; figure 2 *; | [Y]US2014163539 (DELONZOR RUSSELL L [US], et al) [Y] 6 * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0019]; figures 2,3 * * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0025] *; | [A]US2015018809 (MIHALIK TERESA ANN [CA]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0037]; figure 6 *; | [A]US9636172 (HU YIXIN [CA]) [A] 1-15 * figures 3a,b *; | [A]US2018333192 (SLIWA JOHN W [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0020] ** paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0056]; figures 3,4a *; | [Y]WO2018226751 (ST JUDE MEDICAL CARDIOLOGY DIV INC [US]) [Y] 15 * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0036]; figure 4 * |