EP3879873 - INFORMATION TRANSMISSION METHOD, NETWORK DEVICE, TERMINAL DEVICE AND STORAGE MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.08.2021 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.07.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.12.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2021/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHAO, Hua Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
HUANG, Huang Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 03 /
TANG, Xiaoyong Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 04 /
CHEN, Lei Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2021/37] | Representative(s) | Thun, Clemens Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Karlstraße 7 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/37] | Thun, Clemens Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstraße 33 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 19904008.0 | 12.12.2019 | [2021/37] | WO2019CN124859 | Priority number, date | CN201811644947 | 29.12.2018 Original published format: CN201811644947 | [2021/37] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020135071 | Date: | 02.07.2020 | Language: | ZH | [2020/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3879873 | Date: | 15.09.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 02.07.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.11.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04W72/04 | [2021/52] | CPC: |
H04W24/02 (EP,CN);
H04B7/0695 (EP,US);
H04B7/0408 (EP);
H04B7/0617 (EP);
H04W72/0446 (US);
H04W72/0453 (US);
|
Former IPC [2021/37] | H04W24/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/37] | Title | German: | INFORMATIONSÜBERTRAGUNGSVERFAHREN, NETZWERKVORRICHTUNG, ENDGERÄTEVORRICHTUNG UND SPEICHERMEDIUM | [2021/37] | English: | INFORMATION TRANSMISSION METHOD, NETWORK DEVICE, TERMINAL DEVICE AND STORAGE MEDIUM | [2021/37] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE TRANSMISSION D'INFORMATIONS, DISPOSITIF DE RÉSEAU, DISPOSITIF TERMINAL ET SUPPORT D'INFORMATIONS | [2021/37] | Entry into regional phase | 07.06.2021 | Translation filed | 07.06.2021 | National basic fee paid | 07.06.2021 | Search fee paid | 07.06.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.06.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.06.2021 | Examination requested [2021/37] | 21.06.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2015358129 (RYU JUNG HO [US], et al); | [X]WO2018094966 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]); | [XI]WO2018210243 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]); | [P]EP3512235 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]); | [P]EP3537781 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]) |