EP3896563 - TOUCH POSITION ADJUSTMENT METHOD AND DEVICE, STORAGE MEDIUM, AND ELECTRONIC DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.09.2021 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.07.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.11.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZTE Corporation ZTE Plaza, Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2021/42] | For all designated states ZTE Corporation ZTE Plaza, Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHEN, Shaowu ZTE Plaza Keji Road South, Hi-Tech Industrial Park, Nanshan Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | 02 /
LIU, Liting ZTE Plaza Keji Road South, Hi-Tech Industrial Park, Nanshan Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2021/42] | Representative(s) | Swindell & Pearson Limited 48 Friar Gate Derby DE1 1GY / GB | [2021/42] | Application number, filing date | 19904613.7 | 05.11.2019 | [2021/42] | WO2019CN115499 | Priority number, date | CN201811643738 | 29.12.2018 Original published format: CN201811643738 | [2021/42] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020134582 | Date: | 02.07.2020 | Language: | ZH | [2020/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3896563 | Date: | 20.10.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 02.07.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.12.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/0488, H01Q1/24, H04M1/02, H04M1/72454 | [2022/03] | CPC: |
G06F3/0418 (EP);
G06F3/0488 (EP,CN);
H01Q1/243 (EP);
H01Q1/245 (EP);
H01Q21/28 (EP);
H04M1/724 (CN);
|
Former IPC [2021/42] | G06F3/0488 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/42] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR EINSTELLUNG DER BERÜHRUNGSPOSITION, SPEICHERMEDIUM UND ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG | [2021/42] | English: | TOUCH POSITION ADJUSTMENT METHOD AND DEVICE, STORAGE MEDIUM, AND ELECTRONIC DEVICE | [2021/42] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF D'AJUSTEMENT DE POSITION TACTILE, SUPPORT DE STOCKAGE ET DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE | [2021/42] | Entry into regional phase | 14.07.2021 | Translation filed | 14.07.2021 | National basic fee paid | 14.07.2021 | Search fee paid | 14.07.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.07.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.07.2021 | Examination requested [2021/42] | 11.07.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2015019894 (SHARP KK [JP]); | [XI]CN106911848 (GUANGDONG OPPO MOBILE TELECOMMUNICATIONS CORP LTD); | [YA]CN108848269 (SHENZHEN TINNO WIRELESS TECH CO LTD, et al); | [XYI]US2018358991 (KWOK MING SHAN [US]) |