EP3745362 - VEHICLE RECORDING CONTROL DEVICE, VEHICLE RECORDING DEVICE, VEHICLE RECORDING CONTROL METHOD, AND PROGRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.01.2023 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.10.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.07.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.05.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JVCKenwood Corporation 3-12, Moriyacho Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 2210022 / JP | [2020/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TABATA, Kiyofumi c/o Intellectual Property Department, JVCKENWOOD Corporation, 3-12, Moriyacho, Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 221-0022 / JP | [2020/49] | Representative(s) | Klang, Alexander H. Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | [2020/49] | Application number, filing date | 19905103.8 | 11.06.2019 | [2020/49] | WO2019JP23078 | Priority number, date | JP20180243051 | 26.12.2018 Original published format: JP 2018243051 | [2020/49] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020136942 | Date: | 02.07.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3745362 | Date: | 02.12.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 02.07.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.04.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G07C5/08 | [2021/22] | CPC: |
G07C5/0866 (EP);
G06V20/588 (US);
G06V20/40 (US);
G07C5/00 (EP);
G07C5/0841 (US)
|
Former IPC [2020/49] | G07C5/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/49] | Title | German: | FAHRZEUGAUFZEICHNUNGSTEUERUNGSVORRICHTUNG, FAHRZEUGAUFZEICHNUNGSVORRICHTUNG, FAHRZEUGAUFZEICHNUNGSTEUERUNGSVERFAHREN UND PROGRAMM | [2020/49] | English: | VEHICLE RECORDING CONTROL DEVICE, VEHICLE RECORDING DEVICE, VEHICLE RECORDING CONTROL METHOD, AND PROGRAM | [2020/49] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE D'ENREGISTREMENT DE VÉHICULE, DISPOSITIF D'ENREGISTREMENT DE VÉHICULE, PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE D'ENREGISTREMENT DE VÉHICULE, ET PROGRAMME | [2020/49] | Entry into regional phase | 25.08.2020 | Translation filed | 25.08.2020 | National basic fee paid | 25.08.2020 | Search fee paid | 25.08.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.08.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.08.2020 | Examination requested [2020/49] | 16.11.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.01.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.05.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IA]JP2014236492 (DENSO CORP) | International search | [A]JP2010160814 (FUJITSU TEN LTD) [A] 1-9* , *; | [A]JP2012221134 (HITACHI AUTOMOTIVE SYSTEMS LTD) [A] 1-9 * , *; | [A]JP2014236492 (DENSO CORP) [A] 1-9 * , *; | [A]JP2018163463 (PANASONIC IP MAN CORP) [A] 1-9 * , * | by applicant | JP2006321357 |