EP3905400 - MEMBRANE HUMIDIFIER FOR FUEL CELL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.08.2024 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.04.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.06.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.10.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.07.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | Change - divisional application(s) | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kolon Industries, Inc. 110, Magokdong-ro Gangseo-gu Seoul 07793 / KR | [2021/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OH, Young Seok Magok-dong)110, Magokdong-ro, Gangseo-gu Seoul 07793 / KR | 02 /
KIM, Kyoung Ju Magok-dong)110, Magokdong-ro, Gangseo-gu Seoul 07793 / KR | 03 /
AHN, Woong Jeon Magok-dong)110, Magokdong-ro, Gangseo-gu Seoul 07793 / KR | [2024/37] |
Former [2021/44] | 01 /
OH, Young Seok Seoul 07793 / KR | ||
02 /
KIM, Kyoung Ju Seoul 07793 / KR | |||
03 /
AHN, Woong Jeon Seoul 07793 / KR | Representative(s) | Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Nymphenburger Straße 4 80335 München / DE | [2021/44] | Application number, filing date | 19906004.7 | 20.12.2019 | [2021/44] | WO2019KR18173 | Priority number, date | KR20180171473 | 28.12.2018 Original published format: KR 20180171473 | [2021/44] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020138854 | Date: | 02.07.2020 | Language: | KO | [2020/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3905400 | Date: | 03.11.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3905400 | Date: | 11.09.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 02.07.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.09.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H01M8/04119, H01M8/0662, B01D69/08, B01D46/00, B01D63/02 | [2022/42] | CPC: |
B01D63/02 (EP,KR,US);
H01M8/04149 (EP,KR,US);
B01D46/0027 (KR);
B01D69/08 (KR);
H01M8/0687 (EP,KR,US);
B01D2257/302 (KR);
B01D2257/40 (KR);
B01D2257/406 (KR);
B01D2311/04 (EP);
B01D2311/2626 (EP);
B01D2313/20 (EP,KR,US);
B01D2313/201 (US);
|
Former IPC [2021/44] | H01M8/04119, H01M8/0662, B01D69/08, B01D46/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/44] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MEMBRANBEFEUCHTER FÜR BRENNSTOFFZELLE | [2021/44] | English: | MEMBRANE HUMIDIFIER FOR FUEL CELL | [2021/44] | French: | HUMIDIFICATEUR DE MEMBRANE POUR PILE À COMBUSTIBLE | [2021/44] | Entry into regional phase | 29.06.2021 | Translation filed | 29.06.2021 | National basic fee paid | 29.06.2021 | Search fee paid | 29.06.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.06.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.06.2021 | Examination requested [2021/44] | 12.04.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.06.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.10.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.11.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.02.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.04.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.07.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 31.07.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.07.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP24197195.1 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2009117415 (LEISTER KLAUS [DE], et al); | [Y]US2011239866 (COAN FREDERICK L [US], et al); | [XY]DE102014205029 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]); | [Y]US2018145357 (COMS FRANK D [US], et al); | [XP]WO2019240481 (KOLON INC [KR]); | [E]EP3812035 (KOLON INC [KR]) | International search | [Y]JP2009507350 ; | [A]KR20130029306 (HYUNDAI MOTOR CO LTD [KR], et al); | [A]KR20140003182 (KOLON INC [KR]); | [Y]KR20140038223 (HYUNDAI MOTOR CO LTD [KR], et al); | [A]KR20150113503 (KOLON INC [KR]) | by applicant | KR20010001022 | KR20010006122 | KR20010006128 | KR20010021217 | KR20010026696 | KR20010063366 | KR20090013304 | KR20090057773 | KR20090128005 | KR20000108092 | KR20000131631 |