EP3889022 - LEANING VEHICLE WITH A LEFT- RIGHT PAIR OF WHEELS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2021/40] | INCLINING VEHICLE EQUIPPED WITH ONE PAIR OF LEFT AND RIGHT WHEELS | ||
[2023/01] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.11.2023 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 09.12.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.07.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.09.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.07.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states YAMAHA HATSUDOKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2500 Shingai Iwata-shi, Shizuoka 438-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2021/40] | For all designated states YAMAHA HATSUDOKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2500 Shingai Iwata-shi Shizuoka 438-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TERADA, Keisuke c/o YAMAHA HATSUDOKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA, 2500, Shingai Iwata-shi, Shizuoka 438-8501 / JP | 02 /
UCHIYAMA, Toshifumi c/o YAMAHA HATSUDOKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA, 2500, Shingai Iwata-shi, Shizuoka 438-8501 / JP | 03 /
ARAKI, Keizo c/o AISIN CORPORATION, 2-1 Asahi-machi Kariya-shi, Aichi 448-8650 / JP | 04 /
KUBO, Shota c/o AISIN CORPORATION, 2-1 Asahi-machi Kariya-shi, Aichi 448-8650 / JP | [2021/40] | Representative(s) | Stöckeler, Ferdinand Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler Zinkler, Schenk & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Radlkoferstrasse 2 81373 München / DE | [2021/40] | Application number, filing date | 19906491.6 | 27.12.2019 | [2021/40] | WO2019JP51353 | Priority number, date | JP20180244901 | 27.12.2018 Original published format: JP 2018244901 | [2021/40] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020138388 | Date: | 02.07.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3889022 | Date: | 06.10.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3889022 | Date: | 11.01.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 02.07.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.01.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B62K5/027, B62K5/10, B62K5/08, B62J45/414, B62J45/412, B62J45/40, B62K5/05, B62K21/00 | [2022/08] | CPC: |
B62K5/08 (EP);
B62K5/10 (EP,US);
B62D61/065 (US);
B62D61/08 (US);
B62D9/02 (US);
B62J45/40 (EP);
B62J45/412 (EP);
B62J45/414 (EP);
B62K21/00 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2021/40] | B62K21/00, B62K5/027, B62K5/05, B62K5/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/40] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NEIGUNGSFAHRZEUG MIT EINEM LINKS-RECHTS-PAAR VON RÄDERN | [2023/01] | English: | LEANING VEHICLE WITH A LEFT- RIGHT PAIR OF WHEELS | [2023/01] | French: | VÉHICULE À INCLINAISON AVEC UNE PAIRE DE ROUES GAUCHE ET DROITE | [2023/01] |
Former [2021/40] | MIT EINEM PAAR LINKER UND RECHTER RÄDER AUSGESTATTETES NEIGEFAHRZEUG | ||
Former [2021/40] | INCLINING VEHICLE EQUIPPED WITH ONE PAIR OF LEFT AND RIGHT WHEELS | ||
Former [2021/40] | VÉHICULE INCLINABLE ÉQUIPÉ D'UNE PAIRE DE ROUES GAUCHE ET DROITE | Entry into regional phase | 02.07.2021 | Translation filed | 02.07.2021 | National basic fee paid | 02.07.2021 | Search fee paid | 02.07.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.07.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.07.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.07.2021 | Examination requested [2021/40] | 22.07.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.11.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 29.11.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.11.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 12.10.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 11.01.2023 | CZ | 11.01.2023 | DK | 11.01.2023 | EE | 11.01.2023 | ES | 11.01.2023 | FI | 11.01.2023 | HR | 11.01.2023 | LT | 11.01.2023 | LV | 11.01.2023 | MC | 11.01.2023 | NL | 11.01.2023 | PL | 11.01.2023 | RO | 11.01.2023 | RS | 11.01.2023 | SE | 11.01.2023 | SI | 11.01.2023 | SK | 11.01.2023 | SM | 11.01.2023 | NO | 11.04.2023 | GR | 12.04.2023 | IS | 11.05.2023 | PT | 11.05.2023 | [2024/40] |
Former [2024/11] | AT | 11.01.2023 | |
CZ | 11.01.2023 | ||
DK | 11.01.2023 | ||
EE | 11.01.2023 | ||
ES | 11.01.2023 | ||
FI | 11.01.2023 | ||
HR | 11.01.2023 | ||
LT | 11.01.2023 | ||
LV | 11.01.2023 | ||
NL | 11.01.2023 | ||
PL | 11.01.2023 | ||
RO | 11.01.2023 | ||
RS | 11.01.2023 | ||
SE | 11.01.2023 | ||
SI | 11.01.2023 | ||
SK | 11.01.2023 | ||
SM | 11.01.2023 | ||
NO | 11.04.2023 | ||
GR | 12.04.2023 | ||
IS | 11.05.2023 | ||
PT | 11.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AT | 11.01.2023 | |
CZ | 11.01.2023 | ||
DK | 11.01.2023 | ||
EE | 11.01.2023 | ||
ES | 11.01.2023 | ||
FI | 11.01.2023 | ||
HR | 11.01.2023 | ||
LT | 11.01.2023 | ||
LV | 11.01.2023 | ||
NL | 11.01.2023 | ||
PL | 11.01.2023 | ||
RO | 11.01.2023 | ||
RS | 11.01.2023 | ||
SE | 11.01.2023 | ||
SK | 11.01.2023 | ||
SM | 11.01.2023 | ||
NO | 11.04.2023 | ||
GR | 12.04.2023 | ||
IS | 11.05.2023 | ||
PT | 11.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AT | 11.01.2023 | |
CZ | 11.01.2023 | ||
DK | 11.01.2023 | ||
EE | 11.01.2023 | ||
ES | 11.01.2023 | ||
FI | 11.01.2023 | ||
HR | 11.01.2023 | ||
LT | 11.01.2023 | ||
LV | 11.01.2023 | ||
NL | 11.01.2023 | ||
PL | 11.01.2023 | ||
RO | 11.01.2023 | ||
RS | 11.01.2023 | ||
SE | 11.01.2023 | ||
SM | 11.01.2023 | ||
NO | 11.04.2023 | ||
GR | 12.04.2023 | ||
IS | 11.05.2023 | ||
PT | 11.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 11.01.2023 | |
DK | 11.01.2023 | ||
EE | 11.01.2023 | ||
ES | 11.01.2023 | ||
FI | 11.01.2023 | ||
HR | 11.01.2023 | ||
LT | 11.01.2023 | ||
LV | 11.01.2023 | ||
NL | 11.01.2023 | ||
PL | 11.01.2023 | ||
RS | 11.01.2023 | ||
SE | 11.01.2023 | ||
SM | 11.01.2023 | ||
NO | 11.04.2023 | ||
GR | 12.04.2023 | ||
IS | 11.05.2023 | ||
PT | 11.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | AT | 11.01.2023 | |
DK | 11.01.2023 | ||
ES | 11.01.2023 | ||
FI | 11.01.2023 | ||
HR | 11.01.2023 | ||
LT | 11.01.2023 | ||
LV | 11.01.2023 | ||
NL | 11.01.2023 | ||
PL | 11.01.2023 | ||
RS | 11.01.2023 | ||
SE | 11.01.2023 | ||
SM | 11.01.2023 | ||
NO | 11.04.2023 | ||
GR | 12.04.2023 | ||
IS | 11.05.2023 | ||
PT | 11.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/39] | AT | 11.01.2023 | |
ES | 11.01.2023 | ||
FI | 11.01.2023 | ||
HR | 11.01.2023 | ||
LT | 11.01.2023 | ||
LV | 11.01.2023 | ||
NL | 11.01.2023 | ||
PL | 11.01.2023 | ||
RS | 11.01.2023 | ||
SE | 11.01.2023 | ||
NO | 11.04.2023 | ||
GR | 12.04.2023 | ||
IS | 11.05.2023 | ||
PT | 11.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AT | 11.01.2023 | |
ES | 11.01.2023 | ||
FI | 11.01.2023 | ||
HR | 11.01.2023 | ||
LT | 11.01.2023 | ||
LV | 11.01.2023 | ||
NL | 11.01.2023 | ||
PL | 11.01.2023 | ||
RS | 11.01.2023 | ||
SE | 11.01.2023 | ||
NO | 11.04.2023 | ||
GR | 12.04.2023 | ||
PT | 11.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AT | 11.01.2023 | |
ES | 11.01.2023 | ||
FI | 11.01.2023 | ||
HR | 11.01.2023 | ||
LT | 11.01.2023 | ||
LV | 11.01.2023 | ||
NL | 11.01.2023 | ||
RS | 11.01.2023 | ||
SE | 11.01.2023 | ||
NO | 11.04.2023 | ||
GR | 12.04.2023 | ||
PT | 11.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/36] | AT | 11.01.2023 | |
ES | 11.01.2023 | ||
FI | 11.01.2023 | ||
HR | 11.01.2023 | ||
LT | 11.01.2023 | ||
LV | 11.01.2023 | ||
NL | 11.01.2023 | ||
RS | 11.01.2023 | ||
SE | 11.01.2023 | ||
NO | 11.04.2023 | ||
PT | 11.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AT | 11.01.2023 | |
ES | 11.01.2023 | ||
HR | 11.01.2023 | ||
LT | 11.01.2023 | ||
NL | 11.01.2023 | ||
RS | 11.01.2023 | ||
NO | 11.04.2023 | ||
PT | 11.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | ES | 11.01.2023 | |
LT | 11.01.2023 | ||
NL | 11.01.2023 | ||
RS | 11.01.2023 | ||
PT | 11.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | ES | 11.01.2023 | |
LT | 11.01.2023 | ||
NL | 11.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/31] | NL | 11.01.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2007193803 (GEISER FRIEDRICH [AT]) [A] 1-9* abstract *; | [A]JP2011131620 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [A] 1-9 * abstract *; | [AD]JP2017177905 (EQUOS RES CO LTD) [AD] 1-9 * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0013]; figures 1-20; claim - * * paragraph [0125] - paragraph [0145] * | International search | [Y]JP2006218937 (AISIN AW CO, et al)[Y] 1-5; | [Y]JP2011131620 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [Y] 1-5; | [Y]JP2012020739 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [Y] 1-5; | [Y]JP2017177905 (EQUOS RES CO LTD) [Y] 1-5 | by applicant | JP2017177905 |