Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11794845 | Global Dossier | 24.10.2023 | B2 | US2021316809 | 14.10.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2018244901 | 27.12.2018 | WO2019JP51353 | 27.12.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3889022 | Global Dossier | 11.01.2023 | B1 | EP3889022 | 23.02.2022 | A4 | EP3889022 | 06.10.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2018244901 | 27.12.2018 | WO2019JP51353 | 27.12.2019 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2020138388 | Global Dossier | 02.07.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2018244901 | 27.12.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2022043370 | Global Dossier | 16.03.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2018244901 | 27.12.2018 |