EP3903488 - AN ENCODER, A DECODER AND CORRESPONDING METHODS FOR TILE CONFIGURATION SIGNALING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 23.02.2024 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.10.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.10.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.07.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.02.2024 | Refusal of application | published on 27.03.2024 [2024/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HUAWEI TECHNOLOGIES CO., LTD. Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2021/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SYCHEV, Maxim Kamenka Str., b. 1639, Fl. 225 Zelenograd Moscow, 124365 / RU | 02 /
HENDRY, Fnu 8584 Foxcroft Place San Diego, California 92129 / US | 03 /
WANG, Ye-Kui 6264 Sunrose Crest Way San Diego, California 92130 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2021/44] | 01 /
SYCHEV, Maxim Moscow, 124365 / RU | ||
02 /
HENDRY, Fnu San Diego, California 92129 / US | |||
03 /
WANG, Ye-Kui San Diego, California 92130 / US | Representative(s) | Roth, Sebastian Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Karlstraße 7 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/44] | Roth, Sebastian Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstraße 33 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 19906962.6 | 31.12.2019 | [2021/44] | WO2019US69137 | Priority number, date | US201862787067P | 31.12.2018 Original published format: US 201862787067 P | [2021/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020142540 | Date: | 09.07.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3903488 | Date: | 03.11.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.07.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 09.07.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.02.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04N19/119, H04N19/174, H04N19/70, H04N19/157 | [2022/09] | CPC: |
H04N19/119 (EP,KR);
H04N19/136 (KR,US);
H04N19/70 (EP,KR,US);
H04N19/157 (EP);
H04N19/174 (EP,US);
H04N19/184 (KR,US);
H04N19/44 (KR)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2021/44] | H04N19/134 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/44] | Title | German: | CODIERER, DECODIERER UND ENTSPRECHENDES VERFAHREN ZUR KACHELKONFIGURATIONSSIGNALISIERUNG | [2021/44] | English: | AN ENCODER, A DECODER AND CORRESPONDING METHODS FOR TILE CONFIGURATION SIGNALING | [2021/44] | French: | CODEUR, DÉCODEUR ET PROCÉDÉS CORRESPONDANTS DE SIGNALISATION DE CONFIGURATION DE MOSAÏQUE | [2021/44] | Entry into regional phase | 29.07.2021 | National basic fee paid | 29.07.2021 | Search fee paid | 29.07.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.07.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.07.2021 | Examination requested [2021/44] | 29.08.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.11.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.03.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.11.2023 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2024/13] | 14.11.2023 | Date of oral proceedings | 21.11.2023 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 22.11.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2024/13] | Divisional application(s) | EP24152799.3 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI] - ARILD FULDSETH (CISCO) ET AL, "Tiles", 5. JCT-VC MEETING; 96. MPEG MEETING; 16-3-2011 - 23-3-2011; GENEVA;(JOINT COLLABORATIVE TEAM ON VIDEO CODING OF ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11AND ITU-T SG.16 ); URL: HTTP://WFTP3.ITU.INT/AV-ARCH/JCTVC-SITE/,, (20110311), no. JCTVC-E408, XP030008914 [X] 1-3,8-10,15,17,19-27 * abstract * * Section 2 * [I] 4-7,11-14,16,18 | [A] - YASUGI Y ET AL, "AHG12: Flexible tile partitioning", no. JVET-L0359, (20181011), 12. JVET MEETING; 20181003 - 20181012; MACAO; (THE JOINT VIDEO EXPLORATION TEAM OF ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-T SG.16 ),, URL: http://phenix.int-evry.fr/jvet/doc_end_user/documents/12_Macao/wg11/JVET-L0359-v6.zip JVET-L0359.pptx, (20181011), XP030195384 [A] 1-27 * the whole document * | [A] - Y-K WANG (HUAWEI) ET AL, "On slicing and tiling in VVC", no. JVET-L0114, (20180925), 12. JVET MEETING; 20181003 - 20181012; MACAO; (THE JOINT VIDEO EXPLORATION TEAM OF ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-T SG.16 ),, URL: http://phenix.int-evry.fr/jvet/doc_end_user/documents/12_Macao/wg11/JVET-L0114-v1.zip JVET-L0114-v1-SlicingTiling.docx, (20180925), XP030193755 [A] 1-27 * abstract * | [XP] - SYCHEV (HUAWEI) M ET AL, "AHG12: On tile configuration signalling", no. JVET-M0137, (20190102), 13. JVET MEETING; 20190109 - 20190118; MARRAKECH; (THE JOINT VIDEO EXPLORATION TEAM OF ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-T SG.16 ),, URL: http://phenix.int-evry.fr/jvet/doc_end_user/documents/13_Marrakech/wg11/JVET-M0137-v1.zip JVET-M0137-v1.docx, (20190102), XP030200201 [XP] 1-27 * the whole document * | International search | [A]US2015341642 (HENDRY HENDRY [KR], et al) [A] 1-3, 8-10, 15-17, 22-24, 35-37 * ; see entire document *; | [A]US9332259 (WANG YE-KUI [US], et al) [A] 1-3, 8-10, 15-17, 22-24, 35-37* ; see entire document *; | [X]US2017318288 (WU YONGJUN [US], et al) [X] 1-3, 8-10, 15-17, 22-24, 35-37 * ; figure 10, paragraphs [0050], [0053], [0054], [0059], [0060], [0062], [0063], [0066], [0090]-[0092], [0105], [0160], [0169] * |