EP3906026 - IRREVERSIBLE INHIBITORS OF MENIN-MLL INTERACTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.04.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.10.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.07.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.08.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Biomea Fusion, LLC 726 Main Street Redwood City, CA 94063 / US | [2021/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BUTLER, Thomas 726 Main Street Redwood City, CA 94063 / US | 02 /
PALMER, Jim 726 Main Street Redwood City, CA 94063 / US | 03 /
UPASANI, Ravi 726 Main Street Redwood City, CA 94063 / US | 04 /
WELSCH, Matthew 726 Main Street Redwood City, CA 94063 / US | 05 /
VEMPATI, Sridhar 726 Main Street Redwood City, CA 94063 / US | 06 /
KELLY, Brendan 726 Main Street Redwood City, CA 94063 / US | 07 /
PAINTER, Edward 726 Main Street Redwood City, CA 94063 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2021/45] | 01 /
BUTLER, Thomas Redwood City, CA 94063 / US | ||
02 /
PALMER, Jim Redwood City, CA 94063 / US | |||
03 /
UPASANI, Ravi Redwood City, CA 94063 / US | |||
04 /
WELSCH, Matthew Redwood City, CA 94063 / US | |||
05 /
VEMPATI, Sridhar Redwood City, CA 94063 / US | |||
06 /
KELLY, Brendan Redwood City, CA 94063 / US | |||
07 /
PAINTER, Edward Redwood City, CA 94063 / US | Representative(s) | Petty, Catrin Helen, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [2021/45] | Application number, filing date | 19906970.9 | 31.12.2019 | [2021/45] | WO2019US69155 | Priority number, date | US201862786842P | 31.12.2018 Original published format: US 201862786842 P | [2021/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020142557 | Date: | 09.07.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3906026 | Date: | 10.11.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.07.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 09.07.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.09.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/41, C07C235/42, C07D487/04 | [2022/42] | CPC: |
A61P35/02 (EP,IL,KR);
C07D487/04 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K31/5377 (KR);
A61P35/00 (KR);
A61P37/00 (KR);
C07D401/04 (US);
C07D401/06 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2021/45] | A61K31/41, C07C235/42 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/45] | Title | German: | IRREVERSIBLE INHIBITOREN DER MENIN-MLL-INTERAKTION | [2021/45] | English: | IRREVERSIBLE INHIBITORS OF MENIN-MLL INTERACTION | [2021/45] | French: | INHIBITEURS IRRÉVERSIBLES DE L'INTERACTION MÉNINE-MLL | [2021/45] | Entry into regional phase | 02.06.2021 | National basic fee paid | 02.06.2021 | Search fee paid | 02.06.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.06.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.06.2021 | Examination requested [2021/45] | 14.04.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.04.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.08.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2015195228 (ARIAD PHARMA INC [US], et al); | [A]WO2016148114 (NAT UNIV CORP HOKKAIDO UNIV [JP]); | [A]WO2017192543 (UNIV MICHIGAN [US]) | International search | [Y]WO2005041879 (PHARMACIA CORP [US], et al); | [Y]US2009215742 (FUNK LEE ANDREW [US], et al); | [A]US2013143926 (DONALD ALASTAIR DAVID GRAHAM [GB], et al); | [A]WO2015040425 (VERNALIS R&D LTD [GB]) | by applicant | US3598122 | US3598123 | US3710795 | US3731683 | US3742951 | US3814097 | US3921636 | US3972995 | US3993072 | US3993073 | US3996934 | US4031894 | US4060084 | US4069307 | US4077407 | US4151273 | US4201211 | US4229447 | US4230105 | US4292299 | US4292303 | US4327725 | US4343789 | US4476116 | US4596795 | US4624848 | US4755386 | US4871549 | US4968509 | US5011692 | US5017381 | US5033252 | US5052558 | US5116817 | US5229135 | US5260068 | US5260069 | US5281420 | US5323907 | US5336168 | US5340591 | US5456923 | US5461140 | US5508040 | US5516527 | US5567441 | US5622721 | US5665378 | US5686105 | US5700485 | US5700410 | US5723269 | US5739136 | US5837284 | US5837280 | US5840329 | US5858401 | US5869090 | US5977175 | US6083518 | WO0119801 | US6391452 | US6465014 | US6667048 | US2004013734 | US6923983 | US6929801 | US6932983 | US6946144 | US6960563 | WO2017192543 |