EP3887212 - ELECTRONIC APPARATUS AND CONTROLLING METHOD THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.09.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.09.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.07.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.12.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2021/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEE, Youngseok 129, Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 02 /
UM, Taewon 129, Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 03 /
KIM, Jaehoon 129, Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 04 /
KIM, Hyewon 129, Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 05 /
SHIN, Seungwoo 129, Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 06 /
JUN, Yuhyeon 129, Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 07 /
CHOI, Yongjin 129, Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 08 /
HWANG, Wooseok 129, Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2021/40] | Representative(s) | HGF HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/40] | HGF 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | Application number, filing date | 19907151.5 | 27.12.2019 | [2021/40] | WO2019KR18652 | Priority number, date | KR20190000445 | 02.01.2019 Original published format: KR 20190000445 | [2021/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020141820 | Date: | 09.07.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3887212 | Date: | 06.10.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.07.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 09.07.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.11.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B60R16/037, B60R11/02, B60K35/00, B60W50/14 | [2021/40] | CPC: |
B60K35/65 (EP,US);
B60R16/037 (KR);
B60K35/10 (EP,KR,US);
B60K35/00 (US);
B60K35/212 (EP);
B60K35/22 (EP,KR);
B60K35/29 (EP,KR,US);
B60K35/60 (EP,KR,US);
B60K35/654 (EP);
B60K35/81 (EP,KR);
B60R11/0229 (KR);
B60W50/14 (KR);
B60K2360/111 (EP);
B60K2360/113 (EP,US);
B60K2360/115 (EP,US);
B60K2360/122 (EP,US);
B60K2360/126 (EP,US);
B60K2360/128 (EP);
B60K2360/139 (EP);
B60K2360/1438 (US);
B60K2360/148 (EP);
B60K2360/186 (US);
B60K2360/731 (EP,US);
B60K2360/741 (EP);
B60W2050/146 (KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/40] | Title | German: | ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG UND STEUERUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2021/40] | English: | ELECTRONIC APPARATUS AND CONTROLLING METHOD THEREOF | [2021/40] | French: | APPAREIL ÉLECTRONIQUE ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE DE CELUI-CI | [2021/40] | Entry into regional phase | 28.06.2021 | National basic fee paid | 28.06.2021 | Search fee paid | 28.06.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.06.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.06.2021 | Examination requested [2021/40] | 18.03.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.09.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.01.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE102013009603 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]); | [A]US2016077601 (TANAKA TSUYOSHI [JP]); | [A]US2018298959 (BATTLOGG STEFAN [AT]) | International search | [A]KR20120054739 (HYUNDAI MOTOR CO LTD [KR]); | [A]US2015133164 (SONG SANG-GON [KR], et al); | [AX]KR20160021509 (HYUNDAI MOTOR CO LTD [KR]); | [A]US2016353305 (ZAKARIA OMAR [US], et al); | [A]US2018178781 (FUNK TOM [US], et al) | by applicant | US2016077601 |