Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
25.12.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
20.01.2023 | New entry: Reply to examination report | |
23.12.2022 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
30.09.2022 | First examination report | |
29.09.2022 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
24.03.2022 | Amendment by applicant | |
04.03.2022 | Change: Validation states | published on 06.04.2022 [2022/14] |
04.03.2022 | Change - extension states | published on 06.04.2022 [2022/14] |
24.12.2021 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
27.11.2021 | Supplementary search report | published on 29.12.2021 [2021/52] |
26.11.2021 | Change - classification | published on 29.12.2021 [2021/52] |
26.11.2021 | Change - classification | published on 29.12.2021 [2021/52] |
03.09.2021 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 06.10.2021 [2021/40] |
03.09.2021 | Request for examination filed | published on 06.10.2021 [2021/40] |
04.08.2021 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
13.07.2021 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
30.06.2021 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
30.06.2021 | Amendment by applicant | |
29.06.2021 | Change - representative | |
29.06.2021 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
11.07.2020 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
11.07.2020 | New entry: applicant or inventor |