EP3896885 - WIRELESS NETWORK COMMUNICATION METHOD AND TERMINAL DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.09.2021 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.07.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.12.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2021/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHANG, Lili Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
DENG, Meng Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2021/42] | Representative(s) | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | [2021/42] | Application number, filing date | 19907274.5 | 30.12.2019 | [2021/42] | WO2019CN130050 | Priority number, date | CN201811650647 | 31.12.2018 Original published format: CN201811650647 | [2021/42] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020140877 | Date: | 09.07.2020 | Language: | ZH | [2020/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3896885 | Date: | 20.10.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 09.07.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.01.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04L5/00, H04L5/14 | [2022/09] | CPC: |
H04L5/001 (EP,CN,US);
H04L5/0037 (US);
H04L5/0078 (EP);
H04L5/0092 (EP);
H04L5/1469 (EP);
H04W72/0446 (CN);
|
Former IPC [2021/42] | H04L5/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/42] | Title | German: | DRAHTLOSNETZWERKKOMMUNIKATIONSVERFAHREN UND ENDGERÄTEVORRICHTUNG | [2021/42] | English: | WIRELESS NETWORK COMMUNICATION METHOD AND TERMINAL DEVICE | [2021/42] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE COMMUNICATION DE RÉSEAU SANS FIL ET DISPOSITIF TERMINAL | [2021/42] | Entry into regional phase | 12.07.2021 | Translation filed | 12.07.2021 | National basic fee paid | 12.07.2021 | Search fee paid | 12.07.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.07.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.07.2021 | Examination requested [2021/42] | 23.08.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |