EP3910140 - HINGE DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 13.09.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.10.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.07.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Withdrawal of application | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sugatsune Kogyo Co., Ltd. 8-11 Higashikanda 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101-8633 / JP | [2021/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IIJIMA, Tadashi c/o Sugatsune Kogyo Co., Ltd. 8-11, Higashikanda 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101-8633 / JP | 02 /
MORI, Kazuma c/o Sugatsune Kogyo Co., Ltd. 8-11, Higashikanda 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101-8633 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2021/46] | 01 /
IIJIMA, Tadashi Tokyo 101-8633 / JP | ||
02 /
MORI, Kazuma Tokyo 101-8633 / JP | Representative(s) | Zoli, Filippo Brunacci & Partners S.r.l. Via Pietro Giardini, 625 41125 Modena / IT | [2021/46] | Application number, filing date | 19908195.1 | 20.12.2019 | [2021/46] | WO2019JP50142 | Priority number, date | JP20190003135 | 11.01.2019 Original published format: JP 2019003135 | [2021/46] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020145094 | Date: | 16.07.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3910140 | Date: | 17.11.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 16.07.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.08.2022 | Classification | IPC: | E05D5/12, E05F1/06, E05F3/20, E05F5/02 | [2021/46] | CPC: |
E05F3/20 (EP,US);
E05D3/02 (US);
E05F1/043 (US);
E05F1/061 (EP);
E05F5/02 (EP);
E05Y2201/212 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/46] | Title | German: | SCHARNIERVORRICHTUNG | [2021/46] | English: | HINGE DEVICE | [2021/46] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE CHARNIÈRE | [2021/46] | Entry into regional phase | 26.07.2021 | Translation filed | 26.07.2021 | National basic fee paid | 26.07.2021 | Search fee paid | 26.07.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.07.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.07.2021 | Examination requested [2021/46] | 15.03.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.09.2024 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2024/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB503447 (NEWMAN WILLIAM & SONS LTD, et al) [X] 1* the whole document *; | [XA]US3707014 (KOIVUSALO MAUNO KALEVI) [X] 1 * the whole document * [A] 2-5; | [XA]GB2000546 (MANAHL H) [X] 1 * the whole document * [A] 2-5; | [X]US4190925 (KOIVUSALO MAUNO K [FI]) [X] 1 * the whole document *; | [X]WO2007038815 (BLUM GMBH JULIUS [AT], et al) [X] 1 * the whole document *; | [XA]WO2014006586 (IN & TEC SRL [IT]) [X] 1 * the whole document * [A] 2-5 | International search | [A]JP2002303072 (SAWA KAZU, et al) [A] 1-5 * , entire text, all drawings *; | [A]JP2018009380 (KYOEI KANAMONO SEISAKUSHO KK) [A] 1-5* , entire text, all drawings * | by applicant | JP2018009380 |