13.09.2024 |
Withdrawal of application |
published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] |
15.11.2023 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
17.03.2023 |
Change - request for examination |
published on 19.04.2023 [2023/16] |
15.03.2023 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
14.11.2022 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
27.08.2022 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 28.09.2022 [2022/39] |
26.08.2022 |
Change - classification |
published on 28.09.2022 [2022/39] |
26.08.2022 |
Change - classification |
published on 28.09.2022 [2022/39] |
20.04.2022 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 20.04.2022 [2022/16] |
18.03.2022 |
Change - extension states |
published on 20.04.2022 [2022/16] |
24.01.2022 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
01.12.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
19.11.2021 |
Deletion: Renewal fee paid |
|
12.11.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
15.10.2021 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 17.11.2021 [2021/46] |
15.10.2021 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 17.11.2021 [2021/46] |
21.09.2021 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
18.08.2021 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
30.07.2021 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
28.07.2021 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
27.07.2021 |
Change - representative |
|
27.07.2021 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
18.07.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
18.07.2020 |
New entry: applicant or inventor |
|