EP3911044 - DATA TRANSMISSION METHOD AND DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.08.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.10.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.07.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.02.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [2021/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JIANG, Qinyan 308 Unit 3F, Gate 6, Space 8, Pacific Century Place, No.2A Gong Ti Bei Lu, Chaoyang District Beijing 100027 / CN | 02 /
JIA, Meiyi 308 Unit 3F, Gate 6, Space 8, Pacific Century Place, No.2A Gong Ti Bei Lu, Chaoyang District Beijing 100027 / CN | 03 /
WANG, Xin 308 Unit 3F, Gate 6, Space 8, Pacific Century Place, No.2A Gong Ti Bei Lu, Chaoyang District Beijing 100027 / CN | 04 /
ZHANG, Guoyu 308 Unit 3F, Gate 6, Space 8, Pacific Century Place, No.2A Gong Ti Bei Lu, Chaoyang District Beijing 100027 / CN | 05 /
ZHANG, Lei 308 Unit 3F, Gate 6, Space 8, Pacific Century Place, No.2A Gong Ti Bei Lu, Chaoyang District Beijing 100027 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2021/46] | 01 /
JIANG, Qinyan Beijing 100027 / CN | ||
02 /
JIA, Meiyi Beijing 100027 / CN | |||
03 /
WANG, Xin Beijing 100027 / CN | |||
04 /
ZHANG, Guoyu Beijing 100027 / CN | |||
05 /
ZHANG, Lei Beijing 100027 / CN | Representative(s) | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP Cheapside House 138 Cheapside London EC2V 6BJ / GB | [2021/46] | Application number, filing date | 19908631.5 | 11.01.2019 | [2021/46] | WO2019CN71488 | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020143060 | Date: | 16.07.2020 | Language: | ZH | [2020/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3911044 | Date: | 17.11.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 16.07.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.12.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04L5/00, H04W56/00 | [2022/02] | CPC: |
H04L5/0048 (EP);
H04W56/00 (KR);
H04W56/001 (US);
H04B17/373 (KR);
H04J11/0069 (EP,KR);
H04J11/0073 (EP);
H04J11/0076 (EP);
H04L27/2613 (EP);
H04L5/006 (EP);
H04L5/0085 (EP);
H04L5/0094 (EP);
H04W48/10 (KR);
|
Former IPC [2021/46] | H04W56/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/46] | Title | German: | DATENÜBERTRAGUNGSVERFAHREN UND -VORRICHTUNG | [2021/46] | English: | DATA TRANSMISSION METHOD AND DEVICE | [2021/46] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE TRANSMISSION DE DONNÉES | [2021/46] | Entry into regional phase | 01.07.2021 | Translation filed | 02.07.2021 | National basic fee paid | 02.07.2021 | Search fee paid | 02.07.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.07.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.07.2021 | Examination requested [2021/46] | 22.06.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.08.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.02.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]CN108111276 (ZTE CORP); | [X]WO2018230984 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]); | [Y]WO2018230984 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]); |