EP3909711 - HEAT PIPE STRUCTURE, HEAT SINK, METHOD FOR PRODUCING HEAT PIPE STRUCTURE, AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING HEAT SINK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.06.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.10.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.07.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.12.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO., LTD. 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8322 / JP | [2021/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SASAKI Chiyoshi c/o FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO., LTD., 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8322 / JP | 02 /
ISEMURA Masakazu c/o FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO., LTD., 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8322 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2021/46] | 01 /
SASAKI Chiyoshi Tokyo 100-8322 / JP | ||
02 /
ISEMURA Masakazu Tokyo 100-8322 / JP | Representative(s) | Zacco GmbH Bayerstrasse 83 80335 München / DE | [2021/46] | Application number, filing date | 19909142.2 | 19.12.2019 | [2021/46] | WO2019JP49731 | Priority number, date | JP20190002193 | 09.01.2019 Original published format: JP 2019002193 | [2021/46] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020145066 | Date: | 16.07.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3909711 | Date: | 17.11.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 16.07.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.08.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B23K1/00, B23K1/19, B23K33/00, F28D15/02, F28F13/00, F28F21/08, H01L23/367, H01L23/427 | [2022/39] | CPC: |
F28D15/0275 (EP,US);
B23K1/0012 (EP);
B23K1/19 (EP);
B23K33/006 (EP);
F28D15/0233 (US);
F28F21/089 (EP);
H01L23/427 (EP);
B23K2101/14 (EP);
B23K2103/05 (EP);
B23K2103/10 (EP);
B23K2103/12 (EP);
F28F2275/04 (US);
|
Former IPC [2021/46] | B23K1/00, F28D15/02, F28F19/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/46] | Title | German: | WÄRMEROHRSTRUKTUR, KÜHLKÖRPER, VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER WÄRMEROHRSTRUKTUR UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES KÜHLKÖRPERS | [2021/46] | English: | HEAT PIPE STRUCTURE, HEAT SINK, METHOD FOR PRODUCING HEAT PIPE STRUCTURE, AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING HEAT SINK | [2021/46] | French: | STRUCTURE DE TUBE CALOPORTEUR, DISSIPATEUR THERMIQUE, PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION D'UNE STRUCTURE DE TUBE CALOPORTEUR ET PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION D'UN DISSIPATEUR THERMIQUE | [2021/46] | Entry into regional phase | 09.04.2021 | Translation filed | 09.04.2021 | National basic fee paid | 09.04.2021 | Search fee paid | 09.04.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.04.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.04.2021 | Examination requested [2021/46] | 15.03.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.06.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.10.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5826645 (MEYER IV GEORGE A [US], et al) [A] 1,11 * the whole document *; | [YD]JP2001248982 (FUJIKURA LTD) [YD] 1-16 * abstract *; | [A]US2003102108 (SARRAF DAVID B [US], et al) [A] 1-16 * paragraphs [0006] - [0009] - [0 20] - [0028]; figures 1-4 *; | [A]US7036566 (HUANG TSUNG-HSIEN [TW]) [A] 8,14* figures 1-3 *; | [IA]DE102006052753 (COOLER MASTER CO LTD [TW]) [I] 1,5,8 * paragraphs [0014] - [0019]; figures 1-3 * [A] 2-4,6,7,9-16; | [I]JP2011169506 (FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO LTD) [I] 1-16 * abstract * * paragraphs [0006] , [00 7] , [0 10] , [0 36] - [0040] * * paragraph [0048] *; | [Y]EP3088829 (FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-16 * paragraphs [0024] - [0029] - [0 65] - [0072]; figures 1-3, 14-16 * | International search | [Y]JPH07147358 (FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO LTD) [Y] 1-16; | [A]JPH1079586 (DIAMOND ELECTRIC MFG) [A] 1-16; | [A]JPH11300436 (DENSO CORP) [A] 1-16; | [Y]JP2006308240 (HITACHI CABLE) [Y] 1-16; | [Y]JP2006322665 (TOYO KOHAN CO LTD) [Y] 3-7, 10, 12-13, 15-16; | [A]US2007151711 (CHEN KUO-HSIN [TW], et al)[A] 1-16; | [Y]JP2007218439 (SUMITOMO LIGHT METAL IND) [Y] 2-7, 9-10; | [Y]JP2009142890 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [Y] 7, 13, 16; | [Y]JP2015227768 (FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO LTD) [Y] 1-16 | by applicant | JP2001248982 |