EP3913569 - METHOD FOR SECURING IMAGE AND ELECTRONIC DEVICE PERFORMING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.10.2021 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.07.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.01.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2021/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
POPOV, Artem 129, Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-Gu Suwon-Si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 02 /
POPOV, Oleksandr 129, Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-Gu Suwon-Si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 03 /
KULAKOV, Aleksey 129, Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-Gu Suwon-Si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 04 /
ASTRAKHANTSEV, Andrii 129, Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-Gu Suwon-Si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 05 /
SHCHUR, Oleksandr 129, Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-Gu Suwon-Si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 06 /
TATARINOVA, Yuliia 129, Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-Gu Suwon-Si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2021/47] | 01 /
POPOV, Artem Suwon-Si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | ||
02 /
POPOV, Oleksandr Suwon-Si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | |||
03 /
KULAKOV, Aleksey Suwon-Si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | |||
04 /
ASTRAKHANTSEV, Andrii Suwon-Si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | |||
05 /
SHCHUR, Oleksandr Suwon-Si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | |||
06 /
TATARINOVA, Yuliia Suwon-Si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | Representative(s) | Taor, Simon Edward William, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [2021/47] | Application number, filing date | 19909669.4 | 28.01.2019 | [2021/47] | WO2019KR01157 | Priority number, date | KR20190006926 | 18.01.2019 Original published format: KR 20190006926 | [2021/47] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020149441 | Date: | 23.07.2020 | Language: | KO | [2020/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3913569 | Date: | 24.11.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 23.07.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.02.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G06T1/00, G06T5/50, G06T9/00, H04L9/08, G06F21/32, G06F21/62, G06V40/10, G06F21/00 | [2022/13] | CPC: |
G06V40/10 (EP,US);
G06T1/0021 (EP,KR);
G06T1/0028 (US);
G06F21/32 (EP);
G06F21/6245 (EP);
G06T5/50 (KR);
G06T9/00 (KR,US);
G06V40/12 (US);
G06V40/172 (US);
H04L9/0822 (US);
H04L9/0861 (KR);
H04L9/0866 (EP);
H04N19/467 (EP);
G06T2201/0051 (EP);
G06T2201/0052 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2021/47] | G06T1/00, G06T5/50, G06T9/00, H04L9/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/47] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BILDSICHERUNG UND ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG ZUR DURCHFÜHRUNG DES VERFAHRENS | [2021/47] | English: | METHOD FOR SECURING IMAGE AND ELECTRONIC DEVICE PERFORMING SAME | [2021/47] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR SÉCURISER UNE IMAGE ET DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE LE METTANT EN OEUVRE | [2021/47] | Entry into regional phase | 18.08.2021 | Translation filed | 18.08.2021 | National basic fee paid | 18.08.2021 | Search fee paid | 18.08.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.08.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.08.2021 | Examination requested [2021/47] | 11.05.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2005226470 (KONDO KENJI [JP], et al) [X] 1,8,10,13,15 * abstract * * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0018]; figures 1-10; claim 12 * * paragraph [0043] - paragraph [0049] * * paragraph [0069] * * paragraph [0094] - paragraph [0097] * [I] 2-7,9,11,12,14; | [A]US2017053128 (LEE HO-JUNG [KR], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0087] - paragraph [0097]; figures 4-9 *; | [A] - RIBARIC SLOBODAN ET AL, "De-identification for privacy protection in multimedia content: A survey", SIGNAL PROCESSING. IMAGE COMMUNICATION, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20160601), vol. 47, doi:10.1016/J.IMAGE.2016.05.020, ISSN 0923-5965, pages 131 - 151, XP029753254 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.image.2016.05.020 | International search | [YA]KR20170022592 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [Y] 1, 4, 5, 8-11, 13, 15 [A] 2, 3, 6, 7, 12, 14; | [Y]KR20150099650 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [Y] 1, 4, 5, 8-11, 13, 15; | [A]KR100874382B (UNIV CHUNG ANG IND [KR]) [A] 1-15; | [A]KR20160057101 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-15 * 13-176 *; | [A]KR20140089810 (UNIV HANNAM INST IND ACAD COOP [KR]) [A] 1-15 |