EP3911523 - ONE-HAND OPERATED MULTI-PENCIL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.10.2021 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.07.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.06.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Arminak, Armin 2312 Kinclair Dr. Pasadena, CA 91107 / US | [2021/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2021/47] | Representative(s) | HGF HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/47] | HGF 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | Application number, filing date | 19910662.6 | 20.08.2019 | [2021/47] | WO2019US47213 | Priority number, date | US201962792629P | 15.01.2019 Original published format: US 201962792629 P | US201916430010 | 03.06.2019 Original published format: US201916430010 | [2021/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020149883 | Date: | 23.07.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3911523 | Date: | 24.11.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.07.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 23.07.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.12.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B43K24/18, B43K21/027, B43K27/04, B43K21/18 | [2023/02] | CPC: |
B43K24/183 (EP);
B43K21/16 (US);
B43K21/006 (US);
B43K21/06 (US);
B43K21/18 (EP);
B43K24/10 (US);
B43K24/12 (US);
B43K27/006 (US);
B43K27/02 (US);
B43K27/04 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2021/47] | B43K27/04, B43K24/10, B43K24/16, B43K24/18, B43K27/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/47] | Title | German: | EINHÄNDIG BEDIENBARER MEHRFACHSTIFT | [2021/47] | English: | ONE-HAND OPERATED MULTI-PENCIL | [2021/47] | French: | MULTI-CRAYON ACTIONNÉ PAR UNE SEULE MAIN | [2021/47] | Entry into regional phase | 16.07.2021 | National basic fee paid | 16.07.2021 | Search fee paid | 16.07.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.07.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.07.2021 | Examination requested [2021/47] | 08.03.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB805835 (HEINRICH MORLOCK, et al) [A] 13-15 * the whole document *; | [A]US6217241 (KOBAYASHI SEIICHI [JP]) [A] 13-15* the whole document *; | [A]WO2010024346 (KOTOBUKI & CO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 13-15 * the whole document *; | [XA]EP2762327 (MITSUBISHI PENCIL CO [JP]) [X] 13 * paragraph [0076] - paragraph [0109]; figures 15-22 * [A] 14,15; | [A]US2015343832 (TANI YOSHIKAZU [JP]) [A] 13-15 * the whole document *; | [A]US2017151826 (TANI YOSHIKAZU [JP]) [A] 13-15 * column 2, paragraph 27 - column 4, paragraph 53; figures 1-12 * | International search | [A]GB805835 (HEINRICH MORLOCK, et al) [A] 1-15 * entire document *; | [A]US6217241 (KOBAYASHI SEIICHI [JP]) [A] 1-15* entire document *; | [A]WO2010024346 (KOTOBUKI & CO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * machine translation *; | [A]US2015343832 (TANI YOSHIKAZU [JP]) [A] 1-15 * entire document * | by applicant | EP2762327 |