EP3908552 - LASER-INDUCED GRAPHENE COMPOSITES AND SENSORS AND METHODS OF USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.10.2021 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.10.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 27.07.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.12.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states B.G. Negev Technologies and Applications Ltd., at Ben-Gurion University P.O. Box 653 8410501 Beer Sheva / IL | For all designated states William Marsh Rice University 6100 Main Street Houston, TX 77005 / US | [2021/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TOUR, James, Mitchell 4625 Spruce St Bellaire, TX 77401 / US | 02 /
LUONG, Duy, X. 3831 N. Braeswood Blvd., Apt. 7 Houston, TX 77025 / US | 03 /
YANG, Kaichun 3732 Main Poplar Dr. Houston, TX 77025 / US | 04 /
ARNUSCH, Christopher, John 23 Neve Zin 84990 Midreshet Ben-Gurion / IL | 05 /
SINGH, Swatantra, Pratap 46. 9 Sde Boker Campus 84990 Midreshet Ben-Gurion / IL | 06 /
THAKUR, Amit, Kumar P.O. Box 653 8410501 Beer-Sheva / IL | 07 /
STANFORD, Michael, G. 3 Hermann Museum Circle Dr. Apt. 6108 Houston, TX 77004 / US | 08 /
LI, John, T. 6100 Main Street Houston, TX 77005 / US | 09 /
PRESUTTI, Steven, E. 6100 Main Street Houston, TX 77005 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2021/46] | 01 /
TOUR, James, Mitchell Bellaire, TX 77401 / US | ||
02 /
LUONG, Duy, X. Houston, TX 77025 / US | |||
03 /
YANG, Kaichun Houston, TX 77025 / US | |||
04 /
ARNUSCH, Christopher, John 84990 Midreshet Ben-Gurion / IL | |||
05 /
SINGH, Swatantra, Pratap 84990 Midreshet Ben-Gurion / IL | |||
06 /
THAKUR, Amit, Kumar 8410501 Beer-Sheva / IL | |||
07 /
STANFORD, Michael, G. Houston, TX 77004 / US | |||
08 /
LI, John, T. Houston, TX 77005 / US | |||
09 /
PRESUTTI, Steven, E. Houston, TX 77005 / US | Representative(s) | HGF HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/46] | HGF 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | Application number, filing date | 19910915.8 | 30.12.2019 | [2021/46] | WO2019US68933 | Priority number, date | US201862786000P | 28.12.2018 Original published format: US 201862786000 P | [2021/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2020197606 | Date: | 01.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/40] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3908552 | Date: | 17.11.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.10.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.12.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C01B32/184, B82Y30/00, C01B32/194, H01G11/36, H01M4/583, H01M4/62, B32B9/00 | [2021/46] | CPC: |
C01B32/194 (EP,US);
C01B32/184 (EP,US);
H01G11/36 (EP);
H01M4/362 (EP);
H01M4/587 (EP,US);
H01M4/625 (EP,US);
H10B63/00 (EP,US);
B82Y30/00 (EP);
B82Y40/00 (EP);
C01B2204/22 (EP);
C01B2204/24 (EP);
C01B2204/26 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/46] | Title | German: | LASERINDUZIERTE GRAPHENZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND SENSOREN SOWIE VERWENDUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2021/46] | English: | LASER-INDUCED GRAPHENE COMPOSITES AND SENSORS AND METHODS OF USE THEREOF | [2021/46] | French: | COMPOSITES DE GRAPHÈNE INDUIT PAR LASER ET CAPTEURS ET PROCÉDÉS D'UTILISATION ASSOCIÉS | [2021/46] | Entry into regional phase | 21.09.2021 | National basic fee paid | 21.09.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.09.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.09.2021 | Examination requested [2021/46] | 21.09.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.04.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees BG, TR, SM, SK, SI, SE, RS, RO, PT, PL, NO, NL, MT, MK, MC, LV, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HU, HR, GR, GB, FR, FI, ES, EE, DK, DE, CZ, CY, CH, BE, AT, AL | 21.09.2021 | Request for further processing filed | 21.09.2021 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 04.10.2021 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the filing fee | 21.09.2021 | Request for further processing filed | 21.09.2021 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 04.10.2021 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee | 21.09.2021 | Request for further processing filed | 21.09.2021 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 04.10.2021 | Decision despatched | 21.09.2021 | Request for further processing filed | 21.09.2021 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 04.10.2021 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | by applicant | US2017062821 |