EP3916876 - BATTERY PACK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.04.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.12.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.10.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.08.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.04.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Energy Co., Ltd. 1-1, Matsushita-cho Moriguchi-shi Osaka 570-8511 / JP | [2024/16] |
Former [2024/14] | For all designated states SANYO Electric Co., Ltd. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP | ||
Former [2021/48] | For all designated states SANYO Electric Co., Ltd. 1-1, Sanyo-cho Daito-shi Osaka 574-8534 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WAKABAYASHI, Takeaki c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 02 /
TAKEDA, Kensaku c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2024/20] |
Former [2021/48] | 01 /
WAKABAYASHI, Takeaki Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | ||
02 /
TAKEDA, Kensaku Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | Representative(s) | Novagraaf International SA, et al Chemin de l'Echo 3 1213 Onex, Geneva / CH | [2024/20] |
Former [2021/48] | Vigand, Philippe, et al Novagraaf International SA Chemin de l'Echo 3 1213 Onex - Genève / CH | Application number, filing date | 19911251.7 | 09.12.2019 | [2021/48] | WO2019JP48016 | Priority number, date | JP20190011547 | 25.01.2019 Original published format: JP 2019011547 | [2021/48] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020153017 | Date: | 30.07.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3916876 | Date: | 01.12.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3916876 | Date: | 15.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 30.07.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.02.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H01M50/204, H01M50/242, H01M50/317, H01M50/358, // H01M10/052 | [2022/12] | CPC: |
H01M50/242 (EP);
H01M50/325 (US);
H01M10/056 (US);
H01M10/445 (US);
H01M50/107 (US);
H01M50/204 (EP,US);
H01M50/213 (EP,US);
H01M50/24 (EP);
H01M50/247 (EP,US);
H01M50/317 (EP);
H01M50/358 (EP);
H01M10/052 (EP);
Y02E60/10 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2021/48] | H01M10/0566, H01M2/10, H01M2/12 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/48] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BATTERIEPACK | [2021/48] | English: | BATTERY PACK | [2021/48] | French: | BLOC-BATTERIE | [2021/48] | Entry into regional phase | 14.07.2021 | Translation filed | 14.07.2021 | National basic fee paid | 14.07.2021 | Search fee paid | 14.07.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.07.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.07.2021 | Examination requested [2021/48] | 02.09.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.12.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.04.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 04.04.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.04.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP2016035817 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD) [Y] 1-11 * paragraphs [0025] - [0032] - [0 39]; figures 4(a), 4(b), 5 *; | [Y]US2018241017 (NAKAMURA TSUYOSHI [JP], et al) [Y] 1-11 * paragraphs [0018] , [0 46] - [0048] - [ 112] - [0117]; figures 1, 5, 13, 16; claims 1, 2 *; | [A]US2018269448 (SHIMIZU KEISUKE [JP], et al) [A] 1-11* figures 1, 2; claims 1, 2 * | International search | [A]JP2010061989 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [A] 1-11; | [A]JP2015056323 (LITHIUM ENERGY JAPAN KK)[A] 1-11; | [A]WO2016136193 (PANASONIC IP MAN CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-11; | [A]WO2017073201 (SONY CORP [JP]) [A] 1-11 | by applicant | JP2009212081 |