27.06.2024 |
Refusal of application |
published on 31.07.2024 [2024/31] |
27.03.2024 |
New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings |
|
26.03.2024 |
New entry: Despatch of communication that application is refused |
|
20.03.2024 |
Deletion: Despatch of communication that application is refused |
|
20.03.2024 |
New entry: Despatch of communication that application is refused |
|
18.12.2023 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
11.09.2023 |
New entry: Date of oral proceedings |
|
04.07.2023 |
Change - representative |
|
21.12.2022 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
02.08.2022 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
25.03.2022 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 27.04.2022 [2022/17] |
25.03.2022 |
Change - extension states |
published on 27.04.2022 [2022/17] |
18.01.2022 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 16.02.2022 [2022/07] |
14.01.2022 |
Change - classification |
published on 16.02.2022 [2022/07] |
14.01.2022 |
Change - classification |
published on 16.02.2022 [2022/07] |
10.09.2021 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 13.10.2021 [2021/41] |
10.09.2021 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 13.10.2021 [2021/41] |
04.08.2021 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
16.07.2021 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
07.07.2021 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
07.07.2021 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
07.07.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
06.07.2021 |
Change - representative |
|
06.07.2021 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
03.08.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
03.08.2020 |
New entry: applicant or inventor |
|