EP3893093 - SUPPORT SHEET FOR FOLDABLE TERMINAL DEVICE, AND FOLDABLE TERMINAL DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.12.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.09.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.08.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.12.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.01.2023 [2023/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2021/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIAO, Jenhui Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2021/41] | Representative(s) | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | [2021/41] | Application number, filing date | 19912320.9 | 08.11.2019 | [2021/41] | WO2019CN116625 | Priority number, date | CN201910105747 | 01.02.2019 Original published format: CN201910105747 | CN201910340873 | 25.04.2019 Original published format: CN201910340873 | [2021/41] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020155736 | Date: | 06.08.2020 | Language: | ZH | [2020/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3893093 | Date: | 13.10.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 06.08.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.01.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/041, H04M1/02, G02F1/1333, G09F9/30, H01L51/00, G06F1/16 | [2022/07] | CPC: |
H04M1/0268 (EP,CN,US);
G02F1/133305 (EP);
G02F1/13338 (EP);
G06F1/1652 (EP);
G06F1/1656 (EP);
G06F1/1681 (EP);
G09F9/301 (EP);
H04M1/0216 (EP);
H04M1/026 (CN);
B32B2457/20 (US);
B32B3/30 (US);
G06F2203/04102 (EP);
H04M2250/12 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2021/41] | G06F3/041, H04M1/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/41] | Title | German: | TRÄGERBLATT FÜR EINE FALTBARE ENDGERÄTEVORRICHTUNG SOWIE FALTBARE ENDGERÄTEVORRICHTUNG | [2021/41] | English: | SUPPORT SHEET FOR FOLDABLE TERMINAL DEVICE, AND FOLDABLE TERMINAL DEVICE | [2021/41] | French: | FEUILLE DE SUPPORT POUR DISPOSITIF TERMINAL PLIABLE ET DISPOSITIF TERMINAL PLIABLE | [2021/41] | Entry into regional phase | 07.07.2021 | Translation filed | 07.07.2021 | National basic fee paid | 07.07.2021 | Search fee paid | 07.07.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.07.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.07.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.07.2021 | Examination requested [2021/41] | 19.08.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/04] | 08.09.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2023/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2004070053 (OHARA YOSHIKAZU [JP]); | [X]US2005190531 (GALL THOMAS P [US], et al); | [X]US2008055831 (SATOH TASUKU [JP]); | [X]US2010148654 (YAN JING-YI [TW], et al); | [A]US2013216740 (RUSSELL-CLARKE PETER N [US], et al); | [X]US2017092884 (ZHANG ZHEN [US], et al); | [Y]US2017309843 (KIM MINSOO [KR]); | [XYI]US2018138448 (JIN JIAN [CN], et al); | [E]WO2021000772 (BOE TECHNOLOGY GROUP CO LTD [CN], et al) |