EP3900942 - PLANOGRAPHIC PRINTING PLATE PRECURSOR, METHOD OF PREPARING A PLANOGRAPHIC PRINTING PLATE, AND PLANOGRAPHIC PRINTING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2021/43] | LITHOGRAPHIC PRINTING PLATE PRECURSOR, METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING LITHOGRAPHIC PRINTING PLATE, AND LITHOGRAPHIC PRINTING METHOD | ||
[2024/15] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.08.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.03.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.08.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.09.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.08.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJIFILM Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 106-8620 / JP | [2021/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ENOMOTO, Kazuaki c/o FUJIFILM Corporation 4000, Kawashiri Yoshida-cho Haibara-gun, Shizuoka 421-0396 / JP | 02 /
ARAKI, Kenjiro c/o FUJIFILM Corporation 4000, Kawashiri Yoshida-cho Haibara-gun, Shizuoka 421-0396 / JP | [2024/36] |
Former [2021/43] | 01 /
ENOMOTO, Kazuaki c/o FUJIFILM Corporation, 4000, Kawashiri, Yoshida-cho Haibara-gun, Shizuoka 421-0396 / JP | ||
02 /
ARAKI, Kenjiro c/o FUJIFILM Corporation, 4000, Kawashiri, Yoshida-cho Haibara-gun, Shizuoka 421-0396 / JP | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2021/43] | Application number, filing date | 19913153.3 | 26.12.2019 | [2021/43] | WO2019JP51256 | Priority number, date | JP20190016541 | 31.01.2019 Original published format: JP 2019016541 | [2021/43] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020158288 | Date: | 06.08.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3900942 | Date: | 27.10.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3900942 | Date: | 04.09.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 06.08.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.02.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B41C1/10 | [2022/10] | CPC: |
B41C1/1008 (EP,US);
G03F7/038 (US);
B41F23/02 (US);
B41M1/06 (US);
C08F212/08 (US);
C08F220/06 (US);
C08F220/44 (US);
C08F220/603 (US);
G03F7/11 (US);
B41C1/1016 (EP);
B41C2201/02 (US);
B41C2210/04 (EP,US);
B41C2210/08 (EP,US);
B41C2210/22 (EP);
B41C2210/24 (US);
B41N1/14 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2021/43] | B41N1/14, B41C1/10, B41M1/06, G03F7/00, G03F7/004, G03F7/11 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/43] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FLACHDRUCKPLATTENVORLÄUFER, VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER FLACHDRUCKPLATTE UND FLACHDRUCKVERFAHREN | [2021/43] | English: | PLANOGRAPHIC PRINTING PLATE PRECURSOR, METHOD OF PREPARING A PLANOGRAPHIC PRINTING PLATE, AND PLANOGRAPHIC PRINTING METHOD | [2024/15] | French: | PRÉCURSEUR DE PLAQUE D'IMPRESSION PLANOGRAPHIQUE, MÉTHODE DE PRÉPARATION D'UNE PLAQUE D'IMPRESSION PLANOGRAPHIQUE ET MÉTHODE D'IMPRESSION PLANOGRAPHIQUE | [2024/15] |
Former [2021/43] | LITHOGRAPHIC PRINTING PLATE PRECURSOR, METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING LITHOGRAPHIC PRINTING PLATE, AND LITHOGRAPHIC PRINTING METHOD | ||
Former [2021/43] | PLAQUE ORIGINALE POUR PLAQUE D'IMPRESSION LITHOGRAPHIQUE, PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE PLAQUE D'IMPRESSION LITHOGRAPHIQUE, ET PROCÉDÉ D'IMPRESSION LITHOGRAPHIQUE | Entry into regional phase | 22.07.2021 | Translation filed | 22.07.2021 | National basic fee paid | 22.07.2021 | Search fee paid | 22.07.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.07.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.07.2021 | Examination requested [2021/43] | 30.08.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.08.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.11.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.03.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.07.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 24.07.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.07.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0859284 (NIPPON PAINT CO LTD [JP]); | [A]EP2440977 (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US]) | International search | [A]JP2008256742 (FUJIFILM CORP); | [A]US2009056581 (YU YISONG [CA]); | [XA]JP2013047782 (FUJIFILM CORP); | [PXPA]JP2019018412 (FUJIFILM CORP) | by applicant | US2714066 | US3181461 | US3276868 | US3280734 | US3458311 | JPS4841708B | US3902734 | JPS5137193 | US4153461 | JPS5549729B | JPS5617654B | JPS5849860B | JPS61166544 | JPS6239417B | JPS6239418B | US4689272 | JPH0216765B | JPH0232293B | JPH02304441 | JPH055005 | JPH0545885 | JPH0635174 | JPH08108621 | JPH08505958 | JPH09179296 | JPH09179297 | JPH09179298 | JPH10282679 | JPH10333321 | JP2000250211 | JP2001133969 | JP2001222101 | JP2001253181 | JP2001322365 | JP2001342222 | JP2002023360 | JP2002040638 | JP2002275129 | JP2002278057 | JP2002287344 | JP2002328465 | JP2003064130 | JP2003280187 | JP2003344997 | JP2004294935 | JP2005125749 | JP2005238816 | JP2005250216 | JP2006508380 | JP2006065210 | JP2006188038 | JP2006215263 | JP2006243493 | JP2006239867 | JP2006259137 | JP2006297907 | JP2006315265 | US7153632 | JP2007050660 | JP2007090850 | JP2007094138 | JP2007276454 | JP2007293221 | JP2007293223 | JP2008195018 | JP2008256850 | JP2008284858 | JP2008284817 | JP2008544322 | JP2009090645 | JP2009154525 | JP2009208458 | JP2012148555 | JP2012158022 | JP2012206495 | WO2016027886 | WO2017150039 | JP2019016541 |