EP3918480 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR STORING QUERY PLANS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.04.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.11.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.08.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALIBABA GROUP HOLDING LIMITED Fourth Floor, One Capital Place P.O. Box 847 George Town, Grand Cayman / KY | [2021/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHENG, Fang 525 Almanor Ave, 4th Floor Sunnyvale, California 94085 / US | 02 /
CHEN, Zhe Building 8, No.969 West Wen Yi Road Yu Hang District Hangzhou, Zhejiang 311121 / CN | 03 /
LI, Ruiping 525 Almanor Ave, 4th Floor Sunnyvale, California 94085 / US | 04 /
LUO, Congnan 525 Almanor Ave, 4th Floor Sunnyvale, California 94085 / US | 05 /
DONG, Yu 525 Almanor Ave, 4th Floor Sunnyvale, California 94085 / US | 06 /
ZHANG, Jie 525 Almanor Ave, 4th Floor Sunnyvale, California 94085 / US | 07 /
ZHANG, Li 525 Almanor Ave, 4th Floor Sunnyvale, California 94085 / US | 08 /
JI, Jiannan Building 8, No.969 West Wen Yi Road Yu Hang District Hangzhou, Zhejiang 311121 / CN | 09 /
CUI, Dongcan Building 8, No.969 West Wen Yi Road Yu Hang District Hangzhou, Zhejiang 311121 / CN | 10 /
ZHAN, Chaoqun Building 8, No.969 West Wen Yi Road Yu Hang District Hangzhou, Zhejiang 311121 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2021/49] | 01 /
ZHENG, Fang Sunnyvale, California 94085 / US | ||
02 /
CHEN, Zhe Hangzhou, Zhejiang 311121 / CN | |||
03 /
LI, Ruiping Sunnyvale, California 94085 / US | |||
04 /
LUO, Congnan Sunnyvale, California 94085 / US | |||
05 /
DONG, Yu Sunnyvale, California 94085 / US | |||
06 /
ZHANG, Jie Sunnyvale, California 94085 / US | |||
07 /
ZHANG, Li Sunnyvale, California 94085 / US | |||
08 /
JI, Jiannan Hangzhou, Zhejiang 311121 / CN | |||
09 /
CUI, Dongcan Hangzhou, Zhejiang 311121 / CN | |||
10 /
ZHAN, Chaoqun Hangzhou, Zhejiang 311121 / CN | Representative(s) | Finnegan Europe LLP 1 London Bridge London SE1 9BG / GB | [2021/49] | Application number, filing date | 19913461.0 | 30.01.2019 | [2021/49] | WO2019CN73885 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020154945 | Date: | 06.08.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3918480 | Date: | 08.12.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.08.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 06.08.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.08.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G06F16/2452 | [2022/37] | CPC: |
G06F16/24524 (EP);
G06F16/24552 (US);
G06F16/185 (EP);
G06F16/24539 (US);
G06F16/24542 (US);
H04L67/1008 (EP);
H04L67/1097 (EP);
H04L67/568 (EP);
H04L69/04 (EP);
G06F2212/401 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2021/49] | G06F12/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/49] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR SPEICHERUNG VON ABFRAGEPLÄNEN | [2021/49] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR STORING QUERY PLANS | [2021/49] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME DE STOCKAGE DE PLANS D'INTERROGATION | [2021/49] | Entry into regional phase | 27.08.2021 | National basic fee paid | 27.08.2021 | Search fee paid | 27.08.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.08.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.08.2021 | Examination requested [2021/49] | 09.03.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.04.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.08.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2022 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   28.03.2022 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]CN101055544 (IBM [US]); | [A]US2013246711 (TESTARDI RICHARD [US], et al); | [A]CN104008064 (IBM); | [X]US2015205535 (JOSHI VIKRAM [US], et al) |