EP3919235 - SURGERY ASSISTING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.09.2023 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.11.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.08.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RIVERFIELD Inc. 8-1-22 Akasaka Minato-ku 1070052 Tokyo / JP | [2023/24] |
Former [2023/22] | For all designated states RIVERFIELD Inc. 20 Samon-cho Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 1600017 / JP | ||
Former [2021/49] | For all designated states RIVERFIELD Inc 20 Samon-cho Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 1600017 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TADANO, Kotaro c/o RIVERFIELD Inc., 20 Samon-cho, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 160-0017 / JP | 02 /
SUZUKI, Masataka c/o RIVERFIELD Inc., 20 Samon-cho, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 160-0017 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2021/49] | 01 /
TADANO, Kotaro Tokyo 160-0017 / JP | ||
02 /
SUZUKI, Masataka Tokyo 160-0017 / JP | Representative(s) | adares Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Reininger & Partner GmbB Tauentzienstraße 7 b/c 10789 Berlin / DE | [2021/49] | Application number, filing date | 19913705.0 | 19.12.2019 | [2021/49] | WO2019JP49857 | Priority number, date | JP20190013248 | 29.01.2019 Original published format: JP 2019013248 | [2021/49] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020158232 | Date: | 06.08.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3919235 | Date: | 08.12.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 06.08.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.10.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B25J9/06, A61B34/30, A61B90/50 | [2021/49] | CPC: |
A61B34/30 (EP);
A61B90/50 (EP,US);
A61B34/37 (US);
A61B2034/301 (US);
A61B2034/302 (EP,US);
A61B2090/506 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/49] | Title | German: | CHIRURGISCHE HILFSVORRICHTUNG | [2021/49] | English: | SURGERY ASSISTING DEVICE | [2021/49] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'AIDE À LA CHIRURGIE | [2021/49] | Entry into regional phase | 24.08.2021 | Translation filed | 30.08.2021 | National basic fee paid | 30.08.2021 | Search fee paid | 30.08.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.08.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.08.2021 | Examination requested [2021/49] | 27.04.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.09.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.12.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.02.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.06.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2004261179 (BLUMENKRANZ STEPHEN J [US]) [A] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [XA]EP2568908 (INTUITIVE SURGICAL OPERATIONS [US]) [X] 1 * the whole document * [A] 7; | [A]WO2016203858 (OLYMPUS CORP [JP]) [A] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [X]EP3119342 (INTUITIVE SURGICAL OPERATIONS [US]) [X] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [XI]WO2018052796 (INTUITIVE SURGICAL OPERATIONS [US]) [X] 1-6 * the whole document * [I] 7; | [A]EP3388015 (KAWASAKI HEAVY IND LTD [JP]) [A] 1-7* the whole document * | International search | [A]WO2016203858 (OLYMPUS CORP [JP]) [A] 1-7* , entire text, all drawings *; | [X]WO2018052796 (INTUITIVE SURGICAL OPERATIONS [US]) [X] 1-7 * , page 15, line 27 to page 18, line 2, page 20, lines 15-31, page 21, line 11 to page 22, line 16, page 24, line 26 to page 25, line 10, page 49, lines 16-18, fig. 2A * | by applicant | JP2012020156 |