EP3918696 - MOTOR WITH NOVEL HOLLOW SHAFT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.09.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.11.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.08.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.09.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.10.2023 [2023/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BMC Co., Ltd. 12, Seombawi-gil, Wongok-myeon Anseong-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2022/38] |
Former [2021/49] | For all designated states Tamas Co., Ltd. (Hanamdong) 153 Sonjaero 287beon-gil Gwangsan-gu Gwangju 62209 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Ok Yun Daebang-dong, Daebang e-Pyeonhansesang Apt.,) 101- 1703, 37 Almata-gil, Dongjak-gu Seoul 06939 / KR | 02 /
LEE, Kea Ho Seonam-dong, Seonun Moaelgaa) 103-1001, 45 Seonunjungang-ro, Gwangsan-gu Gwangju 62401 / KR | 03 /
SIN, Haeng Chul Yuchon-dong, SangmubeodeulMaeul Jugong 1 Cha Apt. 111-1703, 14 Sangmubeodeul-ro 40beon-gil, Seo-gu Gwangju 61910 / KR | 04 /
JEONG, Gwan Seon Wolsan-dong) 2 Daenam-daero 308beon-gil, Nam-gu Gwangju 61654 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2021/49] | 01 /
KIM, Ok Yun Seoul 06939 / KR | ||
02 /
LEE, Kea Ho Gwangju 62401 / KR | |||
03 /
SIN, Haeng Chul Gwangju 61910 / KR | |||
04 /
JEONG, Gwan Seon Gwangju 61654 / KR | Representative(s) | Gulde & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei mbB Wallstraße 58/59 10179 Berlin / DE | [2021/49] | Application number, filing date | 19913856.1 | 18.12.2019 | [2021/49] | WO2019KR18043 | Priority number, date | KR20190013689 | 01.02.2019 Original published format: KR 20190013689 | [2021/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020159078 | Date: | 06.08.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3918696 | Date: | 08.12.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.08.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 06.08.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.09.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H02K7/00, H02K5/04, H02K1/27, F16C3/02, H02K1/278 | [2022/43] | CPC: |
H02K1/278 (EP,KR,US);
F16C3/026 (EP);
F16C41/004 (KR);
H02K1/2786 (US);
H02K15/14 (US);
H02K5/04 (KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2021/49] | H02K7/00, H02K5/04, H02K1/27, F16C41/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/49] | Title | German: | MOTOR MIT NEUER HOHLWELLE | [2021/49] | English: | MOTOR WITH NOVEL HOLLOW SHAFT | [2021/49] | French: | MOTEUR DOTÉ D'UN NOUVEL ARBRE CREUX | [2021/49] | Entry into regional phase | 10.08.2021 | National basic fee paid | 10.08.2021 | Search fee paid | 10.08.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.08.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.08.2021 | Examination requested [2021/49] | 25.04.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/40] | 19.05.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2023/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2007114867 (MARIONI ELIO [IT]) [Y] 3-5* paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0055]; figure 4 *; | [YA]KR20150090692 (LG INNOTEK CO LTD [KR]) [Y] 1-5 * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0023]; figure 1 * [A] 6; | [Y]KR20160001681 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [Y] 2,4,5 * paragraph [0021]; figure 1 *; | [YA]JP2017225319 (NIHON DENSAN KK) [Y] 1-5 * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0022]; figure 1 * [A] 6 | International search | [A]US2008042503 (HARTKORN HANS-WALTER [DE], et al) [A] 1-6* See claims 1-7 and figures 1-5. *; | [AY]KR20150090692 (LG INNOTEK CO LTD [KR]) [A] 3-6 * See paragraphs [0022]-[0023] and figure 1. * [Y] 1-2; | [Y]KR20160001681 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [Y] 2 * See paragraph [0021] and figure 1. *; | [A]US2017237316 (FILGERTSHOFER ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1-6 * See claims 1-6 and figures 1-5. *; | [Y]JP2017225319 (NIHON DENSAN KK) [Y] 1-2 * See paragraph [0022] and figure 1. * |