EP3921632 - SAMPLE INJECTION DIAPHRAGM VALVE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.03.2024 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.11.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.08.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states APN Inc. 2659, boul. du Parc-Technologique Québec, Québec G1P 4S5 / CA | [2021/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEMELIN, Simon 2659, boul. du Parc-Technologique Québec, Québec G1P 4S5 / CA | 02 /
LESSARD, Joël 2659, boul. du Parc-Technologique Québec, Québec G1P 4S5 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [2021/50] | 01 /
LEMELIN, Simon Québec, Québec G1P 4S5 / CA | ||
02 /
LESSARD, Joël Québec, Québec G1P 4S5 / CA | Representative(s) | Schmidt, Martin Peter IXAS Conseil 22 avenue René Cassin 69009 Lyon / FR | [2021/50] | Application number, filing date | 19914411.4 | 07.02.2019 | [2021/50] | WO2019CA50158 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020160634 | Date: | 13.08.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3921632 | Date: | 15.12.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.08.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 13.08.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.08.2022 | Classification | IPC: | F16K7/14, G01N30/20, F16K11/00 | [2022/38] | CPC: |
F16K7/14 (EP);
F16K7/16 (US);
G01N30/20 (EP,US);
G01N2030/201 (EP,US);
G01N2030/205 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2021/50] | G01N30/20, F16K11/00, F16K7/14 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/50] | Title | German: | MEMBRANVENTIL ZUR PROBENINJEKTION | [2021/50] | English: | SAMPLE INJECTION DIAPHRAGM VALVE | [2021/50] | French: | VANNE D'ÉCHANTILLONNAGE À MEMBRANE D'INJECTION | [2021/50] | Entry into regional phase | 03.08.2021 | National basic fee paid | 03.08.2021 | Search fee paid | 03.08.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.08.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.08.2021 | Examination requested [2021/50] | 10.03.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.03.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.09.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2009006742 (MECANIQUE ANALYTIQUE INC [CA], et al); | [I]WO2010025570 (MECANIQUE ANALYTIQUE [CA], et al); | [I]WO2010063125 (MECANIQUE ANALYTIQUE INC [CA], et al); | [XI]DE102012111193 (KOBER STEINWIESEN GMBH & CO KG [DE]); | [I]WO2014138966 (MÉCANIQUE ANALYTIQUE INC [CA]); | International search | [A]US2006185419 (GAMACHE YVES [CA], et al); | [A]EP1880131 (MECANIQUE ANALYTIQUE INC [CA]); | [A]WO2008089583 (MECANIQUE ANALYTIQUE INC [CA], et al); | [A]WO2009006742 (MECANIQUE ANALYTIQUE INC [CA], et al); | [A]WO2010111791 (MECANIQUE ANALYTIQUE INC [CA], et al); | [A]EP2331858 (MECANIQUE ANALYTIQUE INC [CA]); | [A]EP2972290 (MECANIQUE ANALYTIQUE INC [CA]); |