EP3842541 - FILM FOR COLLECTING DNA AND METHOD OF OBTAINING, PURIFYING AND SEQUENCING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.09.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.05.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 15.03.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 31.08.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.09.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.10.2023 [2023/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Blanco, Sergio Escandinavia 298 Dpto. 804 Las Condes Santiago, 7560749 / CL | For all designated states Ortega, Gabriel Edgardo Eloy Martinez 9748 Villa Warcalde Cordoba, 5003 / AR | [2021/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2021/26] | Representative(s) | Isern Patentes y Marcas S.L. Avda. Diagonal, 463 Bis, 2° 08036 Barcelona / ES | [2021/26] | Application number, filing date | 19916540.8 | 10.01.2019 | [2021/26] | WO2019CL50004 | Priority number, date | US201862743753P | 10.10.2018 Original published format: US 201862743753 P | [2021/26] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020073140 | Date: | 16.04.2020 | Language: | ES | [2020/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3842541 | Date: | 30.06.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CL | 16.04.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.10.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/68, A61B5/117, G06K19/08, A61B10/02, B41K1/00 | [2021/26] | CPC: |
A61B10/0096 (EP,BR,US);
A61B10/02 (EP,BR,US);
A61F13/02 (BR);
A61F13/38 (BR);
A61F15/001 (BR);
B32B25/08 (BR,US);
B32B27/08 (EP,US);
B32B27/283 (EP);
B32B27/32 (EP);
B32B7/12 (EP,BR,US);
A61F2013/00604 (BR);
B32B2250/05 (EP);
B32B2307/412 (EP,US);
B32B2307/518 (EP,US);
B32B2307/724 (EP);
B32B2307/7244 (EP);
B32B2307/7265 (EP);
B32B2307/732 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/26] | Extension states | ME | 10.03.2021 | Validation states | MA | 10.03.2021 | Title | German: | FILM ZUM SAMMELN VON DNA UND VERFAHREN ZUR GEWINNUNG, REINIGUNG UND SEQUENZIERUNG | [2021/26] | English: | FILM FOR COLLECTING DNA AND METHOD OF OBTAINING, PURIFYING AND SEQUENCING | [2021/26] | French: | FEUILLE POUR LA COLLECTE D'ADN ET MÉTHODE D'EXTRACTION, DE PURIFICATION ET DE SÉQUENÇAGE | [2021/26] | Entry into regional phase | 10.03.2021 | Translation filed | 10.03.2021 | National basic fee paid | 10.03.2021 | Search fee paid | 10.03.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.03.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.08.2020 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: CL | 10.03.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.03.2021 | Examination requested [2021/26] | 16.05.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/43] | 09.06.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2023/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2022 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   07.07.2022 | 31.01.2023 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]WO2005115243 (SALVA CALCAGNO EDUARDO LUIS [AR], et al) [X] 1,3 * figure 20 * * page 11, line 19 - page 25, line 7 * [Y] 2; | [Y] - QIAGEN, "Sample and Assay Technologies - Qiagen DNA Investigator Handbook", INTERNET CITATION, (20120601), pages 1 - 60, URL: https://www.qiagen.com/us/resources/resourcedetail?id=dcc5a995-3743-4219-914d-94d6a28e49b3&lang=en, XP009526402 [Y] 2 * the whole document * | International search | [A]US6659038 (SALVA CALCAGNO EDUARDO LUIS [AR]) [A] * the whole document *; | [A]AR044409 (SALVA CALCAGNO EDUARDO LUIS [AR]) [A] * the whole document *; | [A]US2009269743 (RYU JAE-SONG [KR], et al) [A] * the whole document *; | [XY]AR100826 (SALVA CALCAGNO EDUARDO LUIS [AR], et al) [X] 1, 7 * the whole document * [Y] 2-6; | [Y] - QIAGEN, "Sample and Assay Technologies - Qiagen DNA Investigator Handbook", QIAamp DNA Investigator Handbook, (20120000), pages 1 - 60, URL: https://www.qiagen.com/us/resources/resourcedetail?id=dcc5a995-3743-4219-914d-94d6a28e49b3&lang=en, (20190603), XP009526402 [Y] 2-6 * the whole document * | [A] - KOPKA, J. et al., "New optimized DNA extraction protocol for fingerprints deposited on a special self- adhesive security seal and other latent samples used for human identification", Journal of forensic sciences, (20110000), vol. 56, no. 5, pages 1235 - 1240, XP055702996 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1556-4029.2011.01853.x | by applicant | KR100326937B | WO03046210 | KR20040006621 | EP1115883 | EP2395338 | - "Guidelines for a quality assurance program for DNA analysis", CrimeLaboratoryDigest, (19950000), vol. 22, pages 21 - 43 | - "The Use of Adhesive Tape for Recovery of DNA from Crime Scene Items", AUTHORBARASH, MRESHEF, ABRAUNER, P, Applicability of DNA Analysis on Adhesive Tape in Forensic Casework, Organization Israel Police Natl Headquarters, (20120700), vol. 57, pages 1036 - 1041 | - "Direct PCR amplification of forensic touch and other challenging DNA samples", CAVANAUGH, SEBATHRICK, AS, JOURNAL OF FORENSIC SCIENCES, Org. Bode Cellmark Forensics Inc, (20100700), vol. 55, pages 1058 - 1064 | - "Analysis of fingerprint samples, testing various conditions, for forensic DNA identification", OSTOJIC, LWURMBACH, E, ANALYTICA CHIMICA ACTA, organization Off Chief Med Examiner, (20170808), vol. 980, pages 41 - 49 | - SCIENCE & JUSTICE font, (20170100), vol. 57, no. 1, pages 35 - 40 |