EP3854289 - DISHWASHING MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.06.2021 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.09.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Foshan Shunde Midea Washing Appliances Manufacturing Co., Ltd. No.20 Gangqian Road Beijiao Shunde Foshan, Guangdong 528311 / CN | For all designated states Midea Group Co., Ltd. B26-28F, Midea Headquarter Building No. 6 Midea Avenue Beijiao Shunde Foshan, Guangdong 528311 / CN | [2021/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIU, Chaopeng No. 20 Gangqian Road, Beijiao, Shunde Foshan, Guangdong 528311 / CN | 02 /
CAI, Siqi No. 20 Gangqian Road, Beijiao, Shunde Foshan, Guangdong 528311 / CN | [2021/30] | Representative(s) | Whitlock, Holly Elizabeth Ann, et al Maucher Jenkins Seventh Floor Offices Artillery House 11-19 Artillery Row London SW1P 1RT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/30] | Lam, Alvin, et al Maucher Jenkins 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 19916577.0 | 04.07.2019 | [2021/30] | WO2019CN94709 | Priority number, date | CN201910138756 | 25.02.2019 Original published format: CN201910138756 | [2021/30] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020173032 | Date: | 03.09.2020 | Language: | ZH | [2020/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3854289 | Date: | 28.07.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 03.09.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.07.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A47L15/16, A47L15/42, D06F39/00, // D06F39/04 | [2021/34] | CPC: |
A47L15/4291 (EP,US);
A47L15/16 (CN);
A47L15/42 (CN);
A47L15/4278 (CN);
A47L15/4285 (EP,CN);
D06F39/04 (EP);
F24H4/02 (EP,CN);
F25B30/02 (EP,CN);
F25B39/02 (EP,CN);
F25B41/00 (EP,CN);
F28D20/00 (EP);
F28D20/0034 (CN);
|
Former IPC [2021/30] | A47L15/16 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/30] | Title | German: | GESCHIRRSPÜLMASCHINE | [2021/30] | English: | DISHWASHING MACHINE | [2021/30] | French: | LAVE-VAISSELLE | [2021/30] | Entry into regional phase | 22.04.2021 | Translation filed | 22.04.2021 | National basic fee paid | 22.04.2021 | Search fee paid | 22.04.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.04.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.04.2021 | Examination requested [2021/30] | 10.01.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2009125454 (TOSHIBA CORP, et al); | [XA]EP3173513 (ELECTROLUX APPLIANCES AB [SE]) | International search | [A]CN105476584 (HANGZHOU SANHUA INST CO LTD); | [A]EP3095372 (ILLINOIS TOOL WORKS [US]); | [A]JP2017029390 (HOSHIZAKI CORP); | [A]CN108042085 (FOSHAN SHUNDE MIDEA WASHING APPLIANCES MFG CO LTD, et al); | [X]CN108670162 (GUANGDONG MIDEA KITCHEN APPLIANCES MFG CO LTD, et al); | [A]CN108836209 (GUANGDONG MIDEA KITCHEN APPLIANCES MFG CO LTD, et al) |