EP3934315 - WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.10.2023 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.02.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.12.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.09.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.11.2023 [2023/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORPORATION 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [2022/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
UCHINO, Daichi c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation, 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | 02 /
SHIMODA, Tadahiro c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation, 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | 03 /
MOCHIZUKI, Mitsuru c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation, 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | 04 /
FUKUI, Noriyuki c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation, 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2022/01] | 01 /
UCHINO, Daichi Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | ||
02 /
SHIMODA, Tadahiro Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | |||
03 /
MOCHIZUKI, Mitsuru Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | |||
04 /
FUKUI, Noriyuki Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | Representative(s) | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte An der Frauenkirche 20 01067 Dresden / DE | [2022/01] | Application number, filing date | 19918013.4 | 01.03.2019 | [2022/01] | WO2019JP08195 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020178918 | Date: | 10.09.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3934315 | Date: | 05.01.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 10.09.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.02.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04W28/04, H04W16/32, H04W72/04, H04L1/08, H04L45/24, H04L1/00, H04W92/14, H04W40/02, H04W28/08 | [2022/13] | CPC: |
H04W40/02 (EP);
H04W28/04 (EP,KR,US);
H04W92/14 (EP,US);
H04L1/08 (EP);
H04L45/24 (EP);
H04W16/32 (EP,KR);
H04W28/0205 (US);
H04W28/06 (KR);
H04W28/0846 (US);
H04W72/04 (EP);
H04W76/15 (KR);
H04W88/085 (KR);
|
Former IPC [2022/01] | H04W28/04, H04W16/32, H04W72/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/01] | Title | German: | DRAHTLOSKOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM | [2022/01] | English: | WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM | [2022/01] | French: | SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATION SANS FIL | [2022/01] | Entry into regional phase | 26.08.2021 | Translation filed | 26.08.2021 | National basic fee paid | 26.08.2021 | Search fee paid | 26.08.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.08.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.08.2021 | Examination requested [2022/01] | 20.09.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.02.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.06.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/46] | 11.07.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2023/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2018204828 (QUALCOMM INC [US]); | International search | [A]WO2018198963 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]); |